Fair Gaming Advocates MA LLC v. VGW Holdings Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Fair Gaming Advocates MA LLC
Defendant: VGW Holdings Ltd., VGW Malta Ltd., VGW Luckyland, Inc. and VGW US, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2023cv12878
Filed: November 28, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Nathaniel M Gorton
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2024 Filing 17 Case file sent to Superior Court of Suffolk County. (Kelly, Danielle)
January 11, 2024 Filing 16 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered. ORDER OF REMAND to the State Court. (Kelly, Danielle)
January 10, 2024 Filing 15 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered ALLOWING #14 Stipulation to Remand to Superior Court of Suffolk County.(Kelly, Danielle)
January 4, 2024 Filing 14 STIPULATION to Remand to Superior Court of Suffolk County by Fair Gaming Advocates MA LLC. (Heath, Quinn)
December 28, 2023 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support re #12 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Fair Gaming Advocates MA LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Heath, Quinn)
December 28, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Fair Gaming Advocates MA LLC.(Heath, Quinn)
December 28, 2023 Filing 11 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Dennis Wells. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at # https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account. You must put the docket number under ADDITIONAL FILER INFORMATION on your form when registering or it will be rejected.Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm.A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (Currie, Haley)
December 28, 2023 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Fair Gaming Advocates MA LLC identifying Corporate Parent FGA DE INC. for Fair Gaming Advocates MA LLC.. (Heath, Quinn)
December 27, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Dennis Wells Filing fee: $ 125, receipt number AMADC-10195078 by Fair Gaming Advocates MA LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certification of Dennis Wells Esq.)(Heath, Quinn)
December 22, 2023 Filing 8 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ENDORSED ORDER entered re #7 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order to Accept Service and Extend Time for Defendants to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint - Treated as an assented-to motion to effect service of process and schedule responsive pleading and motion allowed. (Currie, Haley)
December 20, 2023 Filing 7 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order to Accept Service and Extend Time for Defendants to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by VGW Holdings Ltd., VGW Luckyland, Inc., VGW Malta Ltd., VGW US, Inc.. (LaBrie, Matthew)
December 13, 2023 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Currie, Haley)
December 13, 2023 Filing 5 STATE COURT Record. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(LaBrie, Matthew)
November 28, 2023 Filing 4 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email (Currie, Haley)
November 28, 2023 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Cowan, Nicole)
November 28, 2023 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by VGW Holdings Ltd., VGW Luckyland, Inc., VGW Malta Ltd., VGW US, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent VGW Holdings Ltd. for VGW Luckyland, Inc., VGW Malta Ltd., VGW US, Inc... (LaBrie, Matthew)
November 28, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by VGW Holdings Ltd., VGW Luckyland, Inc., VGW Malta Ltd., VGW US, Inc. ( Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-10150213 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Organization, #3 Declaration in Support of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Category Form)(LaBrie, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fair Gaming Advocates MA LLC v. VGW Holdings Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fair Gaming Advocates MA LLC
Represented By: Quinn Heath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VGW Holdings Ltd.
Represented By: Matthew D. LaBrie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VGW Malta Ltd.
Represented By: Matthew D. LaBrie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VGW Luckyland, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew D. LaBrie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VGW US, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew D. LaBrie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?