Premera Blue Cross v. Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited et al
Plaintiff: Premera Blue Cross
Defendant: Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited, Takeda Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc and Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2023cv12918
Filed: November 30, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Myong J Joun
Referring Judge: M Page Kelley
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 19, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2024 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM in Support re #23 Joint MOTION for Order to Enter Case Management Order No. 1 Coordinating Pretrial Proceedings in Related Actions filed by Premera Blue Cross. (Fidurko, William)
January 19, 2024 Filing 23 Joint MOTION for Order to Enter Case Management Order No. 1 Coordinating Pretrial Proceedings in Related Actions by Premera Blue Cross. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fidurko, William)
January 17, 2024 Filing 22 Judge Myong J. Joun: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #21 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Michael F. Brockmeyer and Ralph E. Labaton. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. Counsel may need to link their CM/ECF account to their upgraded individual pacer account. Instructions on how to link CM/ECF accounts to upgraded pacer account can be found at # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-current-pacer-accounts.htm#link-account. (Dore, Samantha)
January 17, 2024 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Michael F. Brockmeyer and Ralph E. Labaton Filing fee: $ 250, receipt number AMADC-10222680 by Takeda Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc, Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited, Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Barlow, Joshua)
December 22, 2023 Filing 20 Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered: #16 The joint motion to set a briefing schedule is allowed in part and denied in part. Takeda may have until 2/12/24 to file its responsive pleading. If Takeda files a Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 motion, Premera may have until 3/13/24 to file an opposition, if any. If they wish to file replies or sur-replies, the parties must seek leave of the court. Any motion by Takeda for leave to file a reply should be filed within 2 weeks of the filing of Premeras opposition. If the court grants leave to file a reply, any motion by Premera for leave to file a sur-reply should be filed within 2 weeks of the filing of Takedas reply. (Vieira, Leonardo)
December 22, 2023 Filing 19 Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #6 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Appointed Lowey Dannenberg (Vieira, Leonardo)
December 21, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Z Kopel on behalf of Premera Blue Cross (Kopel, Charles)
December 21, 2023 Filing 17 Judge Myong J. Joun: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley Referred for: Full Pretrial, Dispositive Motions (ptd). (York, Steve) Motions referred to M. Page Kelley.
December 21, 2023 Filing 16 Joint MOTION for Order to For Entry of Briefing Schedule by Premera Blue Cross.(Fidurko, William)
December 13, 2023 Filing 15 Judge Myong J. Joun: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Uriel Rabinovitz. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. Counsel may need to link their CM/ECF account to their upgraded individual pacer account. Instructions on how to link CM/ECF accounts to upgraded pacer account can be found at # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-current-pacer-accounts.htm#link-account. (Dore, Samantha)
December 13, 2023 Filing 14 Judge Myong J. Joun: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Peter D. St. Phillip, Jr.. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. Counsel may need to link their CM/ECF account to their upgraded individual pacer account. Instructions on how to link CM/ECF accounts to upgraded pacer account can be found at # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-current-pacer-accounts.htm#link-account. (Dore, Samantha)
December 13, 2023 Filing 13 Judge Myong J. Joun: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Renee A. Nolan. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. Counsel may need to link their CM/ECF account to their upgraded individual pacer account. Instructions on how to link CM/ECF accounts to upgraded pacer account can be found at # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-current-pacer-accounts.htm#link-account. (Dore, Samantha)
December 13, 2023 Filing 12 Judge Myong J. Joun: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Charles Kopel. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at # https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account. You must put the docket number under ADDITIONAL FILER INFORMATION on your form when registering or it will be rejected.Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm.A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (Dore, Samantha)
December 13, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Uriel Rabinovitz Filing fee: $ 125, receipt number AMADC-10174863 by Premera Blue Cross.(Fidurko, William) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/13/2023: #1 Certificate) (Dore, Samantha). (Main Document 11 replaced on 12/13/2023) (Dore, Samantha).
December 13, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Peter D. St. Phillip, Jr. Filing fee: $ 125, receipt number AMADC-10174847 by Premera Blue Cross.(Fidurko, William) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/13/2023: #1 Certificate) (Dore, Samantha). (Main Document 10 replaced on 12/13/2023) (Dore, Samantha).
December 13, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Renee A. Nolan Filing fee: $ 125, receipt number AMADC-10174831 by Premera Blue Cross.(Fidurko, William) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/13/2023: #1 Certificate) (Dore, Samantha). (Main Document 9 replaced on 12/13/2023) (Dore, Samantha).
December 13, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Charles Kopel Filing fee: $ 125, receipt number AMADC-10174783 by Premera Blue Cross.(Fidurko, William) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/13/2023: #1 Certificate) (Dore, Samantha). (Main Document 8 replaced on 12/13/2023) (Dore, Samantha).
December 13, 2023 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 MOTION to Appoint Counsel for End-Payor Class filed by Premera Blue Cross. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Fidurko, William)
December 13, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION to Appoint Counsel for End-Payor Class by Premera Blue Cross. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fidurko, William)
December 1, 2023 Filing 5 DECLARATION of Certification of Basis for Designation of Relatedness by Premera Blue Cross. (Fidurko, William)
December 1, 2023 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Premera Blue Cross identifying Corporate Parent Premera for Premera Blue Cross.. (Fidurko, William)
November 30, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Takeda Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc, Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited, Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (de Oliveira, Flaviana)
November 30, 2023 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Myong J. Joun assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Phillips, Sophie)
November 30, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc, Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-10154848 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Premera Blue Cross. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form, #3 Affidavit)(Fidurko, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Premera Blue Cross v. Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Premera Blue Cross
Represented By: William J Fidurko
Represented By: Lowey Dannenberg
Represented By: Peter D. St. Phillip, Jr.
Represented By: RENEE A. NOLAN
Represented By: URIEL RABINOVITZ
Represented By: Charles Z Kopel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited
Represented By: Joshua S. Barlow
Represented By: Michael F. Brockmeyer
Represented By: Ralph E. Labaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Takeda Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc
Represented By: Joshua S. Barlow
Represented By: Michael F. Brockmeyer
Represented By: Ralph E. Labaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua S. Barlow
Represented By: Michael F. Brockmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?