Cooper et al v. Associated Industries Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Cooper Donald, Horacio Soares and Donald Cooper
Defendant: Associated Industries Insurance Company and AmTrust E&S Insurance Services
Case Number: 1:2023cv12961
Filed: December 4, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Donald L Cabell
Referring Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2024 Filing 15 Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. ORDER FOR CLOSURE(Paine, Matthew)
January 17, 2024 Filing 14 Judge William G. Young ELECTRONIC ORDER entered: re #13 Motion to Stay. (Paine, Matthew)The case is ordered administratively closed. It may be reopened upon motion of any party once the reference proceeding is concluded.
January 16, 2024 Filing 13 Joint MOTION to Stay by AmTrust E&S Insurance Services, Associated Industries Insurance Company.(Labbe, Brendan)
January 5, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 1/23/2024 02:15 PM in Courtroom 18 (In person only) before Judge William G. Young. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
January 4, 2024 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Reassignment. Judge William G. Young assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Cowan, Nicole)
January 3, 2024 Filing 10 Refusal to Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge, by AmTrust E&S Insurance Services, Associated Industries Insurance Company (Labbe, Brendan) Modified on 1/23/2024 to Correct Docket Text as Counsel Filed the MJ Refusal Under the Wrong Event in CM/ECF NextGen (Paine, Matthew).
December 29, 2023 Filing 9 STATE COURT Record All Defendants.. (Labbe, Brendan)
December 22, 2023 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Notification forms indicating whether or not a party has consented to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge have not been received in the Clerk's Office. The submission of the form is mandatory. Completed forms should be filed promptly. Additional forms can be obtained on the Court's web page at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov. (Russo, Noreen)
December 5, 2023 Filing 7 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email. (Pacho, Arnold)
December 5, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Cowan, Nicole)
December 4, 2023 Filing 5 Defendants ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) , COUNTERCLAIM against Cooper Donald, Horacio Soares by AmTrust E&S Insurance Services, Associated Industries Insurance Company. (Labbe, Brendan)
December 4, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by John A. Donovan, III on behalf of AmTrust E&S Insurance Services, Associated Industries Insurance Company. (Pacho, Arnold)
December 4, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Brendan L. Labbe on behalf of AmTrust E&S Insurance Services, Associated Industries Insurance Company. (Pacho, Arnold)
December 4, 2023 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by AmTrust E&S Insurance Services, Associated Industries Insurance Company. (Pacho, Arnold)
December 4, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by AmTrust E&S Insurance Services, Associated Industries Insurance Company ( Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number AMADC-10159530 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Corporate Disclosure, #2 Civil Action Cover Sheet, #3 Category Sheet, #4 Notice of Appearance JAD, #5 Notice of Appearance BLL)(Labbe, Brendan) (Main Document 1 replaced on 12/4/2023) (Pacho, Arnold). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/4/2023: #6 Exhibit A, #7 Exhibit B) (Pacho, Arnold). Modified on 12/4/2023 to separate exhibits from notice of removal. Corporate disclosure and notices of appearance docketed as separate entries. (Pacho, Arnold).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cooper et al v. Associated Industries Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cooper Donald
Represented By: Michael Medeiros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Horacio Soares
Represented By: Michael Medeiros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Cooper
Represented By: Michael Medeiros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Associated Industries Insurance Company
Represented By: John A. Donovan, III
Represented By: Brendan L. Labbe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmTrust E&S Insurance Services
Represented By: John A. Donovan, III
Represented By: Brendan L. Labbe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?