Williams v. Commonwealth
Plaintiff: Sabrina M Williams and Pro se litigant Sabrina M Williams
Defendant: Commonwealth
Case Number: 1:2023cv12999
Filed: December 6, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Patti B Saris
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 2, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2024 Filing 25 Certified and Transmitted Abbreviated Electronic Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #24 Notice of Appeal. (Paine, Matthew)
February 1, 2024 Filing 24 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #12 Order on Motions and #13 Order Dismissing Case by Sabrina M Williams NOTICE TO COUNSEL: A Transcript Report/Order Form, which can be downloaded from the First Circuit Court of Appeals web site at #http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov MUST be completed and submitted to the Court of Appeals. Counsel shall register for a First Circuit CM/ECF Appellate Filer Account at #http://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/cmecf. Counsel shall also review the First Circuit requirements for electronic filing by visiting the CM/ECF Information section at #http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/cmecf. US District Court Clerk to deliver official record to Court of Appeals by 2/21/2024. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
January 26, 2024 Filing 23 Copy re #22 Order on Motion mailed to Sabrina M Williams 200 Brookside Drive Unit C Andover, MA 01810 on 1/26/2024. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
January 26, 2024 Filing 21 USCA Case Number 24-1108 for #19 Notice of Appeal, filed by Sabrina M Williams. (Paine, Matthew)
January 25, 2024 Filing 20 Certified and Transmitted Abbreviated Electronic Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #19 Notice of Appeal (Paine, Matthew)
January 24, 2024 Filing 22 Judge Patti B. Saris: ENDORSED ORDER entered DENIED #18 Emergency MOTION for Fees. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
January 22, 2024 Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #12 Order on Motions and #13 Order Dismissing Case by Sabrina M Williams. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: A Transcript Report/Order Form, which can be downloaded from the First Circuit Court of Appeals web site at #http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov MUST be completed and submitted to the Court of Appeals. Counsel shall register for a First Circuit CM/ECF Appellate Filer Account at #http://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/cmecf. Counsel shall also review the First Circuit requirements for electronic filing by visiting the CM/ECF Information section at #http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/cmecf. US District Court Clerk to deliver official record to Court of Appeals by 2/12/2024. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
January 22, 2024 Filing 18 Emergency MOTION for Fees by Sabrina M Williams.(Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
January 12, 2024 Filing 17 Copy re #16 Order on Motion to Vacate mailed to Sabrina M Williams 200 Brookside Drive Unit C Andover, MA 01810 on 1/12/2024. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
January 11, 2024 Filing 16 Judge Patti B. Saris: ENDORSED ORDER entered DENIED re #14 Motion to Vacate #12 Order dated 12/21/2023. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
January 11, 2024 Filing 15 Proof of Service filed by Sabrina M Williams (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
January 10, 2024 Filing 14 Rule 60B MOTION to Vacate #12 Order dated 12/21/2023 by Sabrina M Williams.(Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
December 21, 2023 Filing 13 Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER entered. ORDER DISMISSING CASE(PSSA, 3)
December 21, 2023 Filing 12 Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER entered. (1) The motions for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #2 , #9 are GRANTED.(2) The motion for leave to file a notice of removal #8 is DENIED. (3) The motions for a "name change" #3 , #11 are DENIED. (4) This action is DISMISSED. (5) The motion for leave to file electronically #10 is DENIED. (PSSA, 3)
December 15, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION for Reconsideration Plaintiff Requests the name change by Sabrina M Williams.(Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
December 15, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to file electronically Pro Se by Sabrina M Williams.(Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
December 15, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Sabrina M Williams. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
December 13, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Removal by Sabrina M Williams.(Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
December 12, 2023 Filing 7 Supplemental AFFIDAVIT in Support re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
December 7, 2023 Filing 6 EXHIBITS re #5 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint by Sabrina M Williams. (Paine, Matthew)
December 7, 2023 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Commonwealth, filed by Sabrina M Williams.(Paine, Matthew)
December 6, 2023 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Patti B. Saris assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Phillips, Sophie)
December 6, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION moves for name change by Sabrina M Williams.(Castilla, Francis)
December 6, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Sabrina M Williams.(Castilla, Francis)
December 6, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commonwealth, filed by Sabrina M Williams. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Category)(Castilla, Francis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Commonwealth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sabrina M Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pro se litigant Sabrina M Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commonwealth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?