Williams v. EEOC
Plaintiff: Sabrina M Williams and Pro se litigant Sabrina M Williams
Defendant: EEOC
Case Number: 1:2023cv13000
Filed: December 6, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Denise J Casper
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2024 Filing 12 MOTION Summons issued by Sabrina M Williams.(Horvath, Courtney)
January 9, 2024 Filing 11 EXHIBIT re #1 Complaint by Sabrina M Williams. (Horvath, Courtney)
December 26, 2023 Filing 10 Amended NOTICE of Discovery by Sabrina M Williams (Currie, Haley)
December 15, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Sabrina M Williams. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Currie, Haley)
December 15, 2023 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Currie, Haley)
December 15, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to file electronically Pro Se by Sabrina M Williams.(Currie, Haley)
December 12, 2023 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Sabrina Williams in Support re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Sabrina M Williams. (Currie, Haley)
December 6, 2023 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Denise J. Casper assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Paul G. Levenson. (Phillips, Sophie)
December 6, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION for Name change by Sabrina M Williams.(Castilla, Francis)
December 6, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Sabrina M Williams.(Castilla, Francis)
December 6, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against EEOC, filed by Sabrina M Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Category)(Castilla, Francis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. EEOC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sabrina M Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pro se litigant Sabrina M Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EEOC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?