Caitlin Butler et al v. Ford Motor Company
Plaintiff: Caitlin Butler, Shannon Hartman, Pablo Martinez, Amanda Simmons and Steve Joneson
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Case Number: 1:2023cv13031
Filed: December 8, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: F Dennis Saylor
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 8, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 8, 2023 Filing 36 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Danieli, Chris)
December 8, 2023 Filing 35 Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 2:23-cv-08070.
November 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER GRANTING TRANSFER TO DISTRICT OF MASSACHUSETTS #27 by Senior District Judge George H Wu. The Court hereby: GRANTS the Motion (ECF Dkt. no. #27 ) and Stipulation (ECF Dkt. no. #32 ), and ORDERS the above-captioned action transferred to the District of Massachusetts. MD JS-6. Case Terminated. (lom)
November 22, 2023 Filing 33 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Alex R. Straus counsel for Plaintiffs Caitlin Butler, Shannon Hartman, Steve Joneson, Pablo Martinez, Amanda Simmons. Adding Alex R. Straus as counsel of record for Caitlin Butler, Shannon Hartman, Pablo Martinez, Amanda Simmons, and Steve Joneson, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Plaintiffs. (Attorney Alex R. Straus added to party Caitlin Butler(pty:pla), Attorney Alex R. Straus added to party Shannon Hartman(pty:pla), Attorney Alex R. Straus added to party Steve Joneson(pty:pla), Attorney Alex R. Straus added to party Pablo Martinez(pty:pla), Attorney Alex R. Straus added to party Amanda Simmons(pty:pla))(Straus, Alex)
November 22, 2023 Filing 32 Joint STIPULATION to Transfer Case to District of Massachusetts filed by Plaintiffs Caitlin Butler, Shannon Hartman, Steve Joneson, Pablo Martinez, Amanda Simmons. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Transfer)(Belew, Leland)
November 21, 2023 Filing 31 TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - IN CHAMBERS: by Senior District Judge George H. Wu: The parties are advised that the Motion Hearing #27 , set for Monday, November 27, 2023 at 8:30 a.m. will be held in-person and not by telephone. Masks are required. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 6, 2023 Filing 30 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to District of Massachusetts #27 filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Bosslet, Robert)
November 6, 2023 Filing 29 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Robert Bosslet counsel for Defendant Ford Motor Company. Adding Robert W. Bosslet as counsel of record for Ford Motor Company for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attorney Robert Bosslet added to party Ford Motor Company(pty:dft))(Bosslet, Robert)
November 1, 2023 Filing 28 Amended Certificate of Service Re: Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion to Transfer Venue filed by Plaintiffs Caitlin Butler, Shannon Hartman, Steve Joneson, Pablo Martinez, Amanda Simmons re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to District of Massachusetts #27 (Belew, Leland)
October 27, 2023 Filing 27 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to District of Massachusetts filed by Plaintiffs Caitlin Butler, Shannon Hartman, Steve Joneson, Pablo Martinez, Amanda Simmons. Motion set for hearing on 11/27/2023 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Leland H. Belew in support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Transfer Venue, #2 Exhibit Exh. 1 - 2023.08.08 McMillan to Thomasch email re motion to consolidate, #3 Exhibit Exh. 2 - 2023.08.18 Belew to Thomasch email re motion to consolidate, #4 Exhibit Exh. 3 - 2023.07.20 Thomasch to Pltfs email re New 10R80 Actions, #5 Exhibit Exh. 4 - 2023.10.03 Belew to Thomasch email re Chaney & Butler, #6 Exhibit Exh. 5 - 2023.10.04 Thomasch to Belew email re Chaney & Butler, #7 Exhibit Exh. 6 - 2023.10.16 Belew to Landry email re extension on McCabe MTD Reply, #8 Exhibit Exh. 7 - 2023.10.16 Landry to Belew email re extension on McCabe MTD Reply, #9 Exhibit Exh. 8 - 2023.10.24 Belew to Thomasch email re Soehnlein) (Belew, Leland)
October 4, 2023 Filing 26 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Amanda Simmons, Caitlin Butler, Pablo Martinez, Shannon Hartman, Steve Joneson. upon Ford Motor Company waiver sent by Plaintiff on 10/3/2023, answer due 12/4/2023. Waiver of Service signed by Hector Torres, Attorney for Ford Motor Company. (Belew, Leland)
October 3, 2023 Filing 25 Notice of Not Appearing as Attorney of Record by Mark R Miller filed by Plaintiffs Caitlin Butler, Shannon Hartman, Steve Joneson, Pablo Martinez, Amanda Simmons. (Belew, Leland)
October 3, 2023 Filing 24 Notice of Not Appearing as Attorney of Record by Sidney F Robert filed by Plaintiffs Caitlin Butler, Shannon Hartman, Steve Joneson, Pablo Martinez, Amanda Simmons. (Belew, Leland)
October 3, 2023 Filing 23 Notice of Not Appearing as Attorney of Record by John R Fabry filed by of Not Appearing as Attorney of Record by John R Fabry Caitlin Butler, Shannon Hartman, Steve Joneson, Pablo Martinez, Amanda Simmons. (Belew, Leland)
October 3, 2023 Filing 22 Notice of Not Appearing as Attorney of Record by Tyler Litke filed by Plaintiffs Caitlin Butler, Shannon Hartman, Steve Joneson, Pablo Martinez, Amanda Simmons. (Belew, Leland)
October 3, 2023 Filing 21 Notice of Not Appearing as Attorney of Record by Ryan P McMillan filed by Plaintiffs Caitlin Butler, Shannon Hartman, Steve Joneson, Pablo Martinez, Amanda Simmons. (Belew, Leland)
October 3, 2023 Filing 20 Notice of Not Appearing as Attorney of Record by Mitchell Breit filed by Plaintiffs Caitlin Butler, Shannon Hartman, Steve Joneson, Pablo Martinez, Amanda Simmons. (Belew, Leland)
October 3, 2023 Filing 19 Notice of Not Appearing as Attorney of Record by Gregory F Coleman filed by Plaintiffs Caitlin Butler, Shannon Hartman, Steve Joneson, Pablo Martinez, Amanda Simmons. (Belew, Leland)
September 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS BEFORE JUDGE GEORGE H. WU by Judge George H. Wu. You are instructed to read and to follow (unless otherwise superseded herein) the Central District of California Local Rules (henceforth "Local Rules") 16-1 through 16-15 regarding pre-trial requirements. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (aco)
September 28, 2023 Filing 17 DECLARATION of Pablo Martinez re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 Venue Declaration of Pablo Martinez filed by Plaintiffs Caitlin Butler, Shannon Hartman, Steve Joneson, Pablo Martinez, Amanda Simmons. (Belew, Leland)
September 27, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Mark R. Miller. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
September 27, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Sidney F. Robert. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
September 27, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney John R. Rabry. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
September 27, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Tyler Litke. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
September 27, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Mitchell Breit. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
September 27, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Ryan P. McMillan. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
September 27, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Gregory F. Coleman. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
September 27, 2023 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Ford Motor Company. (lh)
September 27, 2023 Filing 8 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
September 27, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
September 27, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (lh)
September 27, 2023 Filing 5 Notice of Pendency of Other Actions filed by Plaintiffs Caitlin Butler, Shannon Hartman, Steve Joneson, Pablo Martinez, Amanda Simmons. (Belew, Leland)
September 27, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, (Belew, Leland)
September 27, 2023 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 filed by Plaintiffs Caitlin Butler, Shannon Hartman, Steve Joneson, Pablo Martinez, Amanda Simmons. (Belew, Leland)
September 27, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Caitlin Butler, Shannon Hartman, Steve Joneson, Pablo Martinez, Amanda Simmons. (Belew, Leland)
September 27, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-36114514 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiffs Amanda Simmons, Caitlin Butler, Pablo Martinez, Shannon Hartman, Steve Joneson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Venue Declaration of Caitlin Butler, #2 Declaration Venue Declaration of Shannon Hartman, #3 Declaration Venue Declaration of Amanda Simmons, #4 Declaration Venue Declaration of Steve Joneson) (Attorney Leland Humphrey Belew added to party Caitlin Butler(pty:pla), Attorney Leland Humphrey Belew added to party Shannon Hartman(pty:pla), Attorney Leland Humphrey Belew added to party Steve Joneson(pty:pla), Attorney Leland Humphrey Belew added to party Pablo Martinez(pty:pla), Attorney Leland Humphrey Belew added to party Amanda Simmons(pty:pla))(Belew, Leland)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caitlin Butler et al v. Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caitlin Butler
Represented By: Alex R. Straus
Represented By: Leland Humphrey Belew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Hartman
Represented By: Leland Humphrey Belew
Represented By: Alex R. Straus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pablo Martinez
Represented By: Leland Humphrey Belew
Represented By: Alex R. Straus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Simmons
Represented By: Leland Humphrey Belew
Represented By: Alex R. Straus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Joneson
Represented By: Alex R. Straus
Represented By: Leland Humphrey Belew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Robert Bosslet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?