StarNet Insurance Company v. Global Cooling, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: StarNet Insurance Company
Defendant: Global Cooling, Inc. doing business as Stirling Ultracold Now known as Biolife Solutions, Inc and VWR International, LLC
Case Number: 1:2023cv13119
Filed: December 18, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Denise J Casper
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2024 Filing 29 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered re #26 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Cross-Claims by Global Cooling, Inc. to 3/1/24 filed by Global Cooling, Inc. APPROVED.(Hourihan, Lisa)
February 5, 2024 Filing 28 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #27 Motion to Continue. Scheduling Conference set for 3/4/2024 02:15 PM in Courtroom 11 (Remote only) before Judge Denise J. Casper.This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the courtroom deputy of the session as soon as possible.Audio access to the hearing may be available to the media and public. Please check the #Court schedule. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html.For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the general orders and public notices of the Court available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. (Hourihan, Lisa)
February 2, 2024 Filing 27 MOTION to Continue Initial Scheduling Conference to March 4, 2024 by Global Cooling, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Mackin, Douglas)
February 2, 2024 Filing 26 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Cross-Claims by Global Cooling, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Mackin, Douglas)
January 30, 2024 Filing 25 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 . (Apjohn, Eric)
January 29, 2024 Filing 24 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 (d)(3) of Kevin Butters by StarNet Insurance Company.(Pugliese, Kevin)
January 29, 2024 Filing 23 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 (d)(3) of Kevin M. Pugliese by StarNet Insurance Company.(Pugliese, Kevin)
January 29, 2024 Filing 22 JOINT SUBMISSION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 (d) by StarNet Insurance Company.(Pugliese, Kevin)
January 26, 2024 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Pugliese on behalf of StarNet Insurance Company (Pugliese, Kevin)
January 17, 2024 Filing 20 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #19 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Kevin M. Pugliese. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at # https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account. You must put the docket number under ADDITIONAL FILER INFORMATION on your form when registering or it will be rejected.Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm.A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (Horvath, Courtney)
January 16, 2024 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Kevin M. Pugliese Filing fee: $ 125, receipt number AMADC-10221170 by StarNet Insurance Company.(Lustig, Mollie)
January 16, 2024 Filing 18 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by StarNet Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Berkley Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Signet Star Holdings, Inc, Corporate Parent W. R. Berkley Corporation for StarNet Insurance Company, StarNet Insurance Company.. (Lustig, Mollie)
January 16, 2024 Filing 17 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered re #16 Stipulation filed by Global Cooling, Inc. to Extend Time to Respond to Cross-Claims by Global Cooling, Inc. to 2/2/24(Hourihan, Lisa)
January 12, 2024 Filing 16 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Cross-Claims by Global Cooling, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Mackin, Douglas)
January 5, 2024 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Global Cooling, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Mackin, Douglas)
January 3, 2024 Filing 14 Judge Denise J. Casper: Standing Order Regarding Appearance of Counsel Via Telephone or Video Conference (Hourihan, Lisa)
January 3, 2024 Filing 13 Judge Denise J. Casper: ORDER entered. Standing Order Re: Courtroom Opportunities for Relatively Inexperienced Attorneys(Hourihan, Lisa)
January 3, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 2/5/2024 02:30 PM in Courtroom 11 (Remote only) before Judge Denise J. Casper. This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the courtroom deputy of the session as soon as possible.Audio access to the hearing may be available to the media and public. Please check the #Court schedule. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html.For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the general orders and public notices of the Court available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. (Hourihan, Lisa)
December 27, 2023 Filing 11 STATE COURT Record. (Apjohn, Eric)
December 22, 2023 Filing 10 Response by Global Cooling, Inc. consenting to removal. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Mackin, Douglas)
December 22, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas James Mackin on behalf of Global Cooling, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Mackin, Douglas)
December 22, 2023 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against StarNet Insurance Company by VWR International, LLC.(Apjohn, Eric)
December 19, 2023 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by StarNet Insurance Company. VWR International, LLC served on 11/28/2023, answer due 12/19/2023. Acknowledgement filed by StarNet Insurance Company. (Lustig, Mollie)
December 19, 2023 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by StarNet Insurance Company. Global Cooling, Inc. served on 11/16/2023, answer due 12/7/2023. Acknowledgement filed by StarNet Insurance Company. (Lustig, Mollie) Modified on 12/19/2023 to adjust date of service and answer date (Currie, Haley).
December 19, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Mollie Hartman Lustig on behalf of StarNet Insurance Company (Lustig, Mollie)
December 19, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by James M. Campbell on behalf of VWR International, LLC (Campbell, James)
December 18, 2023 Filing 3 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email. (de Oliveira, Flaviana)
December 18, 2023 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Denise J. Casper assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Cook, Savannah)
December 18, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by VWR International, LLC ( Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number AMADC-10181743 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form, #3 Exhibit A - Electronic Docket, #4 Exhibit B - Notice of Service of Process, #5 Exhibit C - Complaint, #6 Exhibit D - Civil Action Cover Sheet)(Apjohn, Eric) (Attachment 2 replaced on 12/18/2023) (de Oliveira, Flaviana).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: StarNet Insurance Company v. Global Cooling, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: StarNet Insurance Company
Represented By: Mollie Hartman Lustig
Represented By: Kevin Pugliese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global Cooling, Inc. doing business as Stirling Ultracold Now known as Biolife Solutions, Inc
Represented By: Douglas James Mackin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VWR International, LLC
Represented By: Eric M. Apjohn
Represented By: James M. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?