Polynice v. UL LLC
Plaintiff: Jovana Polynice
Defendant: UL LLC
Other: Judge Robert B. Collings
Case Number: 1:2023cv13186
Filed: December 22, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Paul G Levenson
Referring Judge: Patti B Saris
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2024 Filing 20 NOTICE/LETTER Jointly Filed Proposing Mediation Dates by UL LLC. (Kokodis, Alice)
February 5, 2024 Filing 19 Magistrate Judge Robert B Collings: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. Counsel are directed to confer and provide a joint status report on or before the close of business February 20, 2024 proposing three dates convenient to all parties to conduct a mediation in the requested month of May 2024. ( Status Report due by 2/20/2024)(Simeone, Maria)
January 24, 2024 Filing 18 Notice of assignment to ADR Provider. Judge Robert B. Collings appointed for a mediation date in May 2024.(Simeone, Maria)
January 24, 2024 Filing 17 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Alternative Dispute Resolution for MAY 2024.(mm)
January 24, 2024 Filing 16 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Patti B. Saris: Scheduling Conference held on 1/24/2024 by Video.Joint Statement #10 - Adopted.AMENDMENT TO PLEADINGS - January 31, 2024. All discovery, other than expert discovery, must be completed bySeptember 30, 2024.Dispositive Motions - October 28, 2024.Oppositions due by 11/19/2024.Matter referred to ADR for MAY 2024.(Atty Herold, Kokodis) (Court Reporter: No Court Reporter Used.) (Molloy, Maryellen) Modified docket text on 1/30/2024 in accordance with Joint Statement Adopted. Dk #10 . (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde).
January 22, 2024 Filing 15 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered Granting #14 Joint Motion to Continue Scheduling Conference:This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the courtroom deputy of the session as soon as possible.Audio access to the hearing may be available to the media and public. Please check the #Court schedule. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html.For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the general orders and public notices of the Court available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. Scheduling Conference reset from 1/23/2024 to 1/24/2024 11:30 AM in Remote Proceeding before Judge Patti B. Saris. (Molloy, Maryellen)
January 19, 2024 Filing 14 Joint MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference by UL LLC.(Kokodis, Alice)
January 19, 2024 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Scheduling ConferenceThis hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the courtroom deputy of the session as soon as possible.Audio access to the hearing may be available to the media and public. Please check the #Court schedule. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html.For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the general orders and public notices of the Court available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. Scheduling Conference set for 1/23/2024 11:15 AM in Remote Proceeding before Judge Patti B. Saris. (Molloy, Maryellen)
January 16, 2024 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Reassignment. Judge Patti B. Saris assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Paul G. Levenson. (Cook, Savannah)
January 16, 2024 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Canceling Hearing. Scheduling Conference for 1/17/2024 at 12:00 PM Remote Proceeding : Boston before Magistrate Judge Paul G. Levenson(Dumoulin, Rose)
January 12, 2024 Filing 10 JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference . (Kokodis, Alice)
January 3, 2024 Filing 9 STATE COURT Record. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Kokodis, Alice)
December 29, 2023 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by UL LLC.(Kokodis, Alice)
December 27, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference set for 1/17/2024 at 12:00 PM Remote Proceeding : Boston before Magistrate Judge Paul G. Levenson. (Attachments: #1 Blank Scheduling Order)(Dumoulin, Rose)
December 26, 2023 Filing 6 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email (Cook, Savannah)
December 22, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Paul G. Levenson assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Cook, Savannah)
December 22, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Puneet Kaur Dhaliwal on behalf of UL LLC (Dhaliwal, Puneet)
December 22, 2023 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by UL LLC. (Kokodis, Alice)
December 22, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Alice A. Kokodis on behalf of UL LLC (Kokodis, Alice)
December 22, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by UL LLC ( Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number AMADC-10190782 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Documents, #2 Exhibit B - Notice to State Court, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Category Form)(Kokodis, Alice)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Polynice v. UL LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jovana Polynice
Represented By: Suzanne L. Herold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UL LLC
Represented By: Alice A. Kokodis
Represented By: Puneet Kaur Dhaliwal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Other: Judge Robert B. Collings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?