O'Connor et al v. Sutter Health et al
Plaintiff: Catherine O'Connor and Frank Coats
Defendant: Sutter Health, Welltok, Inc., Progress Software Corporation and Ipswitch Inc
Case Number: 1:2024cv10022
Filed: January 3, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Allison D Burroughs
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2024 Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Catherine O'Connor, Frank Coats. Ipswitch Inc waiver sent on 12/13/2023, answer due 2/12/2024. (Blood, Timothy)
January 10, 2024 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Taylor Yamahata on behalf of Sutter Health (Yamahata, Katherine)
January 10, 2024 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Steve Vieux on behalf of Sutter Health (Vieux, Steve)
January 10, 2024 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean McTigue on behalf of Sutter Health (McTigue, Sean)
January 10, 2024 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Kerry L. Duffy on behalf of Sutter Health (Duffy, Kerry)
January 10, 2024 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen C Steinberg on behalf of Sutter Health (Steinberg, Stephen)
January 10, 2024 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Harvey Bunzel on behalf of Sutter Health (Bunzel, Robert)
January 10, 2024 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael D. Abraham on behalf of Sutter Health (Abraham, Michael)
January 8, 2024 Filing 13 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ORDER entered. MDL Order No. 1 (General Provisions)See MDL Master Docket 23-md-3083 for all subsequent procedural orders. (McManus, Caetlin)
January 3, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL: Pursuant to CTO Number 21 entered in MDL No. 3083, Eastern District of California case number 2:23-cv-02725-KJM-DB has been transferred to the District of Massachusetts and assigned civil action number: 1:24-cv-10022-ADB. In Re: MOVEit Customer Data Security Breach Litigation, MDL 3083 (Belpedio, Lisa)
January 3, 2024 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Allison D. Burroughs assigned to case. (Belpedio, Lisa)
January 3, 2024 Filing 10 Case transferred in from District of California Eastern; Case Number 2:23-cv-02725.
December 19, 2023 Filing 9 MDL ORDER. CASE TRANSFERRED to District of Massachusetts. Electronic Transfer Sent. CASE CLOSED. (Donati, J)
December 15, 2023 Filing 8 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendant Welltok, Inc to File Responsive Pleading by Welltok, Inc.. Attorney Harvey, Amanda Nicole added. (Harvey, Amanda)
December 8, 2023 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Ipswitch, Inc. served on 12/6/2023, answer due 12/27/2023. (Blood, Timothy)
December 4, 2023 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Progress Software Corporation served on 12/1/2023. (Blood, Timothy) Modified on 12/6/2023 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
December 4, 2023 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Welltok, Inc. served on 12/1/2023. (Blood, Timothy) Modified on 12/6/2023 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
December 4, 2023 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Sutter Health served on 12/1/2023. (Blood, Timothy) Modified on 12/6/2023 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
November 21, 2023 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 3/28/2024 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Licea Chavez, V)
November 21, 2023 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Ipswitch, Inc., Progress Software Corporation, Sutter Health, Welltok, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Timothy G. Blood* *Blood Hurst & O'Reardon, LLP* *501 West Broadway Suite 1490* *San Diego, CA 92101*. (Licea Chavez, V)
November 20, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Catherine O'Connor, Frank Coats. Attorney Blood, Timothy G. added. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-11195776) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Blood, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Connor et al v. Sutter Health et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine O'Connor
Represented By: Timothy G. Blood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Coats
Represented By: Timothy G. Blood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sutter Health
Represented By: Katherine Taylor Yamahata
Represented By: Kerry L. Duffy
Represented By: Michael D. Abraham
Represented By: Robert Harvey Bunzel
Represented By: Sean R. McTigue
Represented By: Stephen C Steinberg
Represented By: Steve Vieux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Welltok, Inc.
Represented By: Amanda Nicole Harvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progress Software Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ipswitch Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?