Ace American Insurance Company et al v. Progress Software Corporation
Plaintiff: Ace American Insurance Company and Illinois Union Insurance Company
Defendant: Progress Software Corporation
Case Number: 1:2024cv10140
Filed: January 18, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Allison D Burroughs
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 15, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2024 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Helen L Fitzpatrick on behalf of Ace American Insurance Company, Illinois Union Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Cert of Service)(Fitzpatrick, Helen)
February 15, 2024 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Ernest F. Koschineg on behalf of Ace American Insurance Company, Illinois Union Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Cert of Service)(Koschineg, Ernest)
February 15, 2024 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Jill H. Fertel on behalf of Ace American Insurance Company, Illinois Union Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Fertel, Jill)
February 5, 2024 Filing 15 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Helen L. Fitzpatrick. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at # https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account. You must put the docket number under ADDITIONAL FILER INFORMATION on your form when registering or it will be rejected.Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm.A Notice of Appearance must be entered on this docket and the Master MDL Docket by the newly admitted attorney. (McManus, Caetlin)
February 5, 2024 Filing 14 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jill Fertel. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at # https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account. You must put the docket number under ADDITIONAL FILER INFORMATION on your form when registering or it will be rejected.Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm.A Notice of Appearance must be entered on this docket and the Master MDL Docket by the newly admitted attorney. (McManus, Caetlin)
February 5, 2024 Filing 13 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Ernest F. Koschineg. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at # https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account. You must put the docket number under ADDITIONAL FILER INFORMATION on your form when registering or it will be rejected.Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm.A Notice of Appearance must be entered on this docket and the Master MDL Docket by the newly admitted attorney. (McManus, Caetlin)
February 2, 2024 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Helen L. Fitzpatrick Filing fee: $ 125, receipt number AMADC-10252528 by Ace American Insurance Company, Illinois Union Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Palmeri, Brian)
February 2, 2024 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Jill Fertel Filing fee: $ 125, receipt number AMADC-10252524 by Ace American Insurance Company, Illinois Union Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Palmeri, Brian)
February 2, 2024 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Ernest F. Koschineg Filing fee: $ 125, receipt number AMADC-10252479 by Ace American Insurance Company, Illinois Union Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Palmeri, Brian)
January 30, 2024 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ace American Insurance Company, Illinois Union Insurance Company. Progress Software Corporation waiver sent on 1/18/2024, answer due 3/18/2024. (Palmeri, Brian)
January 30, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Callan G. Stein on behalf of Progress Software Corporation (Stein, Callan)
January 19, 2024 Filing 7 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ORDER entered. MDL Order No. 1 (General Provisions)See MDL Master Docket 23-md-3083 for all subsequent procedural orders. (McManus, Caetlin)
January 18, 2024 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Progress Software Corporation. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (de Oliveira, Flaviana)
January 18, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE OF MDL CASE OPENED, Direct file in the District of Massachusetts; Ace American Insurance Company et al v. Progress Software Corporation. In Re: MOVEit Customer Data Security Breach Litigation, MDL 3083. (Phillips, Sophie)
January 18, 2024 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Allison D. Burroughs assigned to case. (Phillips, Sophie)
January 18, 2024 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by ACE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY a/s/o. (Palmeri, Brian)
January 18, 2024 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by ILLINOIS UNION INSURANCE COMPANY a/s/o. (Palmeri, Brian)
January 18, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number AMADC-10225727 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Ace American Insurance Company, Illinois Union Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Palmeri, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ace American Insurance Company et al v. Progress Software Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ace American Insurance Company
Represented By: Brian Palmeri
Represented By: Ernest F. Koschineg
Represented By: Helen L Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Jill H. Fertel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Illinois Union Insurance Company
Represented By: Brian Palmeri
Represented By: Jill H. Fertel
Represented By: Ernest F. Koschineg
Represented By: Helen L Fitzpatrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progress Software Corporation
Represented By: Callan G. Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?