Bloom v. Campbell
Plaintiff: Gary Michael Bloom
Defendant: William James Campbell, III
Case Number: 1:2024cv10339
Filed: February 12, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Richard G Stearns
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2024 Filing 30 Electronic Notices re 27 Order on Motion for Entry of Default, #28 Notice: Clerk's Entry of Default, #29 Standing Order re motions for default judgment emailed to williamjamescampbell3rd@gmail.com on 4/9/2024 in light of Court's Order 5 granting #4 , motion for alternative service. (McManus, Caetlin)
April 9, 2024 Filing 29 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered. STANDING ORDER on motions for default judgment re #28 Notice: Clerk's Entry of Default. (McManus, Caetlin)
April 9, 2024 Filing 28 NOTICE: Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to William James Campbell, III. (McManus, Caetlin)
April 9, 2024 Filing 27 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #26 Motion for Entry of Default by Clerk. (McManus, Caetlin)
April 5, 2024 Filing 26 MOTION for Entry of Default by Gary Michael Bloom.(Bloom, Gary)
March 27, 2024 Filing 25 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Canceling Hearing. Motion Hearing set for 4/2/2024 10:00 AM before Judge Richard G. Stearns is CANCELED. (Maynard, Timothy)
March 27, 2024 Filing 24 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying #13 Motion to Compel; denying #20 Motion for Sanctions. Defendant has been served and is signed up for electronic notification of filings. (RGS, law3)
March 27, 2024 Filing 23 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying #7 Motion for TRO. On examination of the pleadings, it is apparent to the court that there is no sufficient showing irreparable harm in that any intrinsic value of unique authorship (if such is shown) can be well compensated by money damages. (RGS, law3)
March 26, 2024 Filing 22 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. The parties are reminded that ex parte communications with the court are not allowed and that, if they wish for the court to take any action, they must file a motion in compliance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules for the District of Massachusetts. The parties are further cautioned that, as set forth in those rules, frivolous or vexatious litigation is not allowed, and the parties will be subject to sanctions up to and including entrance of judgment against them for filing motions which abuse the court system or are designed to harass the other party. A response to the complaint is due by March 29, 2024. The court will set a pretrial schedule for discovery once an Answer is filed. (RGS, law3)
March 20, 2024 Filing 21 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Resetting Hearing on Motion #7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order : Motion Hearing set for 4/2/2024 10:00 AM in Courtroom 21 (In person only) before Judge Richard G. Stearns. (Maynard, Timothy)
March 17, 2024 Filing 20 MOTION for Sanctions by Gary Michael Bloom. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Defendant's Response to Notice of Motion Signature Noncompliance)(Bloom, Gary)
March 16, 2024 Filing 19 NOTICE by Gary Michael Bloom re #15 Letter/request (non-motion), #14 Letter/request (non-motion) FRCP 11(a) Noncompliance of Signature (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Noncompliant Signature Blocks)(Bloom, Gary)
March 15, 2024 Filing 18 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying #17 Motion to Dismiss.Although defendant William James Campbell III moves to dismiss the complaint, he fails to address how the allegations in the complaint, viewed in the light most favorable to plaintiff (the standard which the court must apply at this stage in the proceedings), fail to state "to 'state a claim to relief that is plausible on its face.'" Ashcroft v. Iqbal, 556 U.S. 662, 678 (2009), quoting Bell Atl. Corp. v. Twombly, 550 U.S. 544, 570 (2007). The court accordingly denies the motion as insufficiently developed. (RGS, law3)
March 14, 2024 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss by William James Campbell, III. (Pacho, Arnold) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/15/2024: #1 Postage on sender's envelope) (Pacho, Arnold).
March 13, 2024 Filing 16 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Resetting Hearing on Motion #7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order : Motion Hearing set for 3/18/2024 02:00 PM in Courtroom 21 (Remote only) before Judge Richard G. Stearns. (***TIME CHANGE and CHANGED TO ZOOM***) (Maynard, Timothy)
March 12, 2024 Filing 15 Letter/request (non-motion) from Carmine Iacono. (Dumoulin, Rose) Modified docket text on 3/13/2024 (Pacho, Arnold).
March 12, 2024 Filing 14 Letter/response from William Campbell. (Attachments: #1 Letter from Chris Esper, #2 Letter from Carmine T. Iacono, #3 Exhibits, #4 Envelope) (Pacho, Arnold)
March 4, 2024 Filing 13 MOTION to Compel Disclosure of Address by Gary Michael Bloom. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Summons - Affidavit of Not Found from Sheriff's Office, #2 Exhibit B: Email from D Declining to Provide Address, #3 Exhibit C: Email from D Claiming to Block My Emails)(Bloom, Gary)
March 4, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE by Gary Michael Bloom re #10 Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service of Amended Complaint)(Bloom, Gary)
March 4, 2024 Filing 11 RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER by Gary Michael Bloom re 9 Order, . (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit for Serving Notice on D of Motion Hearing)(Bloom, Gary)
March 1, 2024 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against William James Campbell, III, filed by Gary Michael Bloom. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Revised Cover Sheet for Fraud)(Bloom, Gary)
March 1, 2024 Filing 9 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Order, #7 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, and 8 Notice of Hearing on Motion upon defendant by close of business on March 4, 2024. Defendant's opposition, if any, must be filed by close of business on March 14, 2024.(RGS, law3)
March 1, 2024 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion #7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order : Motion Hearing set for 3/18/2024 03:00 PM in Courtroom 21 (In person only) before Judge Richard G. Stearns. (Maynard, Timothy)
February 28, 2024 Filing 7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Gary Michael Bloom. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Email Admissions by Defendant, #2 Exhibit B - Case Law: Hoult v. Hoult)(Bloom, Gary)
February 27, 2024 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Defendant's Reply to Email Service, #2 Exhibit the served Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A of the Complaint, #4 Exhibit the served Summons, #5 Exhibit the served Motion for Alternative Service, #6 Exhibit Exhibits A - D for the Motion, #7 Exhibit Docket printout, #8 Exhibit Email Notification of Motion Grant, #9 Exhibit Letter explaining that Motion was Granted and that he is Served., #10 Affidavit My Affidavit of Completion of Service)(Bloom, Gary)
February 27, 2024 Filing 5 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #4 Motion for Alternative Service. (Pacho, Arnold)
February 26, 2024 Filing 4 MOTION Alternative Service by Gary Michael Bloom. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits in support of Motion)(Bloom, Gary)
February 12, 2024 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to William James Campbell, III. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Kelly, Danielle)
February 12, 2024 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Richard G. Stearns assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Cook, Savannah)
February 12, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against William James Campbell, III Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number AMADC-10265358 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Gary Michael Bloom. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Bloom, Gary) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/12/2024: #3 Exhibit A) (Kelly, Danielle). (Main Document 1 replaced on 2/12/2024) (Kelly, Danielle).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bloom v. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Michael Bloom
Represented By: Gary M. Bloom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William James Campbell, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?