Crowley et al v. Portillo et al
Plaintiff: Lawrence Crowley and Kimberly Crowley
Defendant: Osman Portillo and FedEx Freight, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2024cv10424
Filed: February 22, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Patti B Saris
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2024 Filing 22 AMENDED CORPORATE DISCLOSURE by FedEx Freight, Inc., Osman Portillo. . (Fay, Andrew) Modified on 4/17/2024 to Correct Docket Text (Paine, Matthew).
April 9, 2024 Filing 21 Judge Patti B. Saris: PRETRIAL ORDER entered. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/28/2025 02:30 PM in Courtroom 19 (In person only) before Judge Patti B. Saris. Jury Trial set for 6/9/2025 08:30 AM in Courtroom 19 (In person only) before Judge Patti B. Saris.(MM)
April 9, 2024 Filing 20 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Alternative Dispute Resolution for February 2025.(mm)
April 9, 2024 Filing 19 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Patti B. Saris. Scheduling Conference held on 4/9/2024 by Video.Joint Statement - Adopted, see docket #16 for all deadlines.Pretrial set for May 28, 2025 at 2:30 pm in person.Jury Trial scheduled for June 9, 2025 at 8:30 am in person.Refer to ADR for February 2025.(Court Reporter: No Court Reporter Used.)(Attorneys present: Atty Fay, Johnson) (Molloy, Maryellen)
April 9, 2024 Filing 18 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 . (Fay, Andrew)
April 9, 2024 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by FedEx Freight, Inc., Osman Portillo. (Fay, Andrew)
April 1, 2024 Filing 16 JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference . (Johnson, Paul)
April 1, 2024 Filing 15 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 . (Johnson, Paul)
March 29, 2024 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed (Ballin, Zachary)
March 27, 2024 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed (Ballin, Zachary)
March 21, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary Max Ballin on behalf of Lawrence Crowley (Ballin, Zachary)
March 13, 2024 Filing 11 STATE COURT Record. (Fay, Andrew)
March 12, 2024 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to FedEx Freight, Inc., Osman Portillo. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
March 1, 2024 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by FedEx Freight, Inc., Osman Portillo.(Ferguson, Shalissa)
February 28, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE of Scheduling ConferenceThis hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the courtroom deputy of the session as soon as possible.Audio access to the hearing may be available to the media and public. Please check the #Court schedule. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html.For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the general orders and public notices of the Court available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. Scheduling Conference set for 4/9/2024 11:00 AM in Remote Proceeding before Judge Patti B. Saris. (mm)
February 23, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul R. Johnson on behalf of Kimberly Crowley, Lawrence Crowley (Johnson, Paul)
February 22, 2024 Filing 6 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email (McManus, Caetlin)
February 22, 2024 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Patti B. Saris assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Paul G. Levenson. (Cook, Savannah)
February 22, 2024 Filing 4 ENTRY FILED IN ERROR.
February 22, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew J. Fay on behalf of FedEx Freight, Inc., Osman Portillo (Fay, Andrew)
February 22, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Shalissa M. Ferguson on behalf of FedEx Freight, Inc., Osman Portillo (Ferguson, Shalissa)
February 22, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by FedEx Freight, Inc., Osman Portillo ( Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number AMADC-10281265 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Category Form)(Ferguson, Shalissa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crowley et al v. Portillo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Crowley
Represented By: Zachary Max Ballin
Represented By: Paul R. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Crowley
Represented By: Paul R. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Osman Portillo
Represented By: Andrew J. Fay
Represented By: Shalissa M. Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FedEx Freight, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew J. Fay
Represented By: Shalissa M. Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?