Soknita v. Tristar Risk Management et al
Plaintiff: Sreng Soknita
Defendant: Tristar Risk Management, National Retail Systems, Inc. and Nathan Sitterly
Case Number: 1:2024cv10439
Filed: February 23, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Indira Talwani
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 25, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2024 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Samantha L. Harmon on behalf of National Retail Systems, Inc. (Harmon, Samantha)
April 12, 2024 Filing 17 Judge Indira Talwani: SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Please see attached. SCHEDULING ORDER DEADLINES: Initial disclosures due by April 30, 2024 for plaintiff and May 15, 2024 for the defendants. Motions seeking leave to amend due March 1, 2025. Fact discovery to be completed by March 20, 2025. Plaintiffs' trial experts designated by March 21, 2025.Defendants' trial experts designated by May 5, 2025.Trial experts must be deposed by July 15, 2025. Dispositive Motions due August 15, 2025. NOTICE OF HEARING: Status Conference set for 2/25/2025 02:30 PM in Courtroom 9 (Remote only) before Judge Indira Talwani.This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the courtroom deputy of the session as soon as possible.Audio access to the hearing may be available to the media and public. Please check the #Court schedule. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html.For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the general orders and public notices of the Court available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov.(Kelly, Danielle)
April 9, 2024 Filing 16 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Indira Talwani: Scheduling Conference held on 4/9/2024. Case called. Court had colloquy with counsel. Parties to jointly report to clerk any request for ADR. Proposed dates adopted. Scheduling Order to follow. (DEADLINES SET: Status Report due by 5/10/2024. Motion to Amend Pleadings due by 2/28/2025. Discovery to be completed by 3/20/2025, Expert Discovery to be completed by 7/15/2025. Dispositive Motions due by 8/15/2025.) Status Conference set for 2/25/2025 02:30 PM in Courtroom 9 (Remote only) before Judge Indira Talwani. (Court Reporter: Robert Paschal at rwp.reporter@gmail.com.) (Attorneys present: William D. Keefe, Paul Schor, Samantha Harmon (shall file a notice of appearance once admitted.)) (MacDonald, Gail)
April 9, 2024 Filing 15 JOINT SUBMISSION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by National Retail Systems, Inc., Nathan Sitterly, Tristar Risk Management. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Scheduling Order)(Schor, Paul)
April 5, 2024 Filing 14 Opposition re #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by National Retail Systems, Inc., Nathan Sitterly, Tristar Risk Management. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Schor, Paul)
April 5, 2024 Filing 13 JOINT SUBMISSION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by National Retail Systems, Inc., Nathan Sitterly, Tristar Risk Management.(Schor, Paul)
March 26, 2024 Filing 12 STATE COURT Record. (Attachments: #1 Lowell District Court - Volume I, #2 Lowell District Court - Volume II, #3 Lowell District Court - Volume III, #4 Lowell District Court - Volume 4, #5 Lowell District Court - Volume VI, #6 Lowell District Court - Volume VI, #7 Lowell District Court - Volume VII, #8 Lowell District Court - Volume VIII)(Schor, Paul)
March 22, 2024 Filing 11 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Sreng Soknita.(Keefe, William)
March 22, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by William D. Keefe on behalf of Sreng Soknita (Keefe, William)
March 18, 2024 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Tristar Risk Management identifying Corporate Parent Tristar Service Company, Inc. for Tristar Risk Management.. (Schor, Paul)
March 7, 2024 Filing 8 SEE attached NOTICE of Scheduling Conference, with attached PROPOSED ORDER TEMPLATE. When filing the Joint Statement, counsel must attach a separate, proposed scheduling order using the template attached to this Notice. Scheduling Conference set for 4/9/2024 02:45 PM in Courtroom 9 (Remote only) before Judge Indira Talwani. This proceeding will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the courtroom deputy of the session as soon as possible.Audio access to the hearing may be available to the media and public. Please check the #Court schedule. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html.For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the general orders and public notices of the Court available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Template)(MacDonald, Gail)
February 28, 2024 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Nathan Sitterly.(Schor, Paul)
February 28, 2024 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by National Retail Systems, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent National Retail Systems, Inc. for National Retail Systems, Inc... (Schor, Paul)
February 28, 2024 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by National Retail Systems, Inc..(Schor, Paul)
February 28, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Schor on behalf of National Retail Systems, Inc., Nathan Sitterly, Tristar Risk Management (Schor, Paul)
February 23, 2024 Filing 3 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email (Dore, Samantha)
February 23, 2024 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Indira Talwani assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Phillips, Sophie)
February 23, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by National Retail Systems, Inc. ( Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number AMADC-10283529 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Schor, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Soknita v. Tristar Risk Management et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sreng Soknita
Represented By: John M. Mello, Jr.
Represented By: William D. Keefe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tristar Risk Management
Represented By: Paul Schor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Retail Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Paul Schor
Represented By: Samantha L. Harmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathan Sitterly
Represented By: Paul Schor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?