Sanzo v. Atlantic Capes Fisheries, INC. et al
Plaintiff: Richard Sanzo
Defendant: Atlantic Capes Fisheries, Inc., F/V Enterprise, LLC and Atlantic Harvesters, LLC
Case Number: 1:2024cv10666
Filed: March 18, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Richard G Stearns
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2024 Filing 24 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered re #14 MOTION to Remand. The court will permit plaintiff Richard Sanzo to conduct limited discovery on the issue of jurisdiction. Plaintiff may serve up to five (5) interrogatories and five (5) requests for production on defendant Atlantic Cape Fisheries, Inc. These requests are due no later than May 3, 2024, and defendant must respond within 30 days of receipt. Plaintiff may also conduct one (1) deposition of no more than three (3) hours of a corporate representative. The deposition will be limited in scope to the corporate structure of Atlantic Cape Fisheries, Inc. and the role of various Directors play in controlling its daily activities. All jurisdictional discovery must be completed by June 21, 2024. Plaintiff may file a reply brief of no more than ten (10) pages reflecting evidence gathered during jurisdictional discovery by June 28, 2024.(RGS, law3)
April 22, 2024 Filing 23 Supplemental MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Remand This Action to The Bristol County Superior Court of Massachusetts and in Response to This Honorable Court's Electronic Order of April 16, 2024 filed by Atlantic Capes Fisheries, Inc., Atlantic Harvesters, LLC, F/V Enterprise, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Plaintiff's State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B to Plaintiff's State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit M - Plaintiffs Employment Application, #4 Exhibit N - Plaintiff's Drug Test Result, #5 Exhibit O - Kevin Krauss ADP Pay Stub, #6 Exhibit P - Trip and Landing Reports, #7 Exhibit Q - Fields ADP Pay Stub, #8 Exhibit R - Plaintiffs ADP Pay Stub, #9 Exhibit S - F/V ENTERPRISE Certificate of Documentation)(Blatchley, Samuel)
April 19, 2024 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM in Support re #14 MOTION to Remand This Action to The Bristol County Superior Court of Massachusetts re: Federal Question Jurisdiction filed by Richard Sanzo. (Hasson, James)
April 16, 2024 Filing 21 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered re #14 MOTION to Remand. The parties shall file briefs of no more than 5 pages addressing whether the court has federal question jurisdiction over this action (which appears to assert at least one claim under the Jones Act) such that removal is proper regardless of diversity. The parties briefing is due by April 22, 2024. (RGS, law3)
April 15, 2024 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Remand This Action to The Bristol County Superior Court of Massachusetts filed by Atlantic Capes Fisheries, Inc., Atlantic Harvesters, LLC, F/V Enterprise, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Appendix of Unreported Cases)(Blatchley, Samuel)
April 5, 2024 Filing 19 Document disclosure by Richard Sanzo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hasson, James)
April 1, 2024 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Richard Sanzo. F/V Enterprise, LLC waiver sent on 3/21/2024, answer due 5/20/2024. (Hasson, James)
April 1, 2024 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Richard Sanzo. Atlantic Harvesters, LLC waiver sent on 3/21/2024, answer due 5/20/2024. (Hasson, James)
April 1, 2024 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Richard Sanzo. Atlantic Capes Fisheries, Inc. waiver sent on 3/21/2024, answer due 5/20/2024. (Hasson, James)
April 1, 2024 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Support re #14 MOTION to Remand This Action to The Bristol County Superior Court of Massachusetts filed by Richard Sanzo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1A, #2 Exhibit 1B, #3 Exhibit 2A, #4 Exhibit 2B, #5 Exhibit 2C, #6 Exhibit 2D, #7 Exhibit 2E, #8 Exhibit 2F, #9 Exhibit 2G, #10 Exhibit 3, #11 Exhibit 4A, #12 Exhibit 4B, #13 Exhibit 4C, #14 Exhibit 4D, #15 Exhibit 4E, #16 Exhibit 4F, #17 Exhibit 4G, #18 Exhibit 4H, #19 Exhibit 4I, #20 Exhibit 4J, #21 Exhibit 5A, #22 Exhibit 5B, #23 Exhibit 5C, #24 Exhibit 6A, #25 Exhibit 6B, #26 Exhibit 6C, #27 Exhibit 7A, #28 Exhibit 7B, #29 Exhibit 7C, #30 Exhibit 8A, #31 Exhibit 8B)(Hasson, James)
April 1, 2024 Filing 14 MOTION to Remand This Action to The Bristol County Superior Court of Massachusetts by Richard Sanzo.(Hasson, James)
April 1, 2024 Filing 13 STATE COURT Record. (Blatchley, Samuel)
March 25, 2024 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by F/V Enterprise, LLC. (Blatchley, Samuel)
March 25, 2024 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Atlantic Harvesters, LLC. (Blatchley, Samuel)
March 25, 2024 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Atlantic Capes Fisheries, Inc.. (Blatchley, Samuel)
March 21, 2024 Filing 9 DECLARATION Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 7.1(a)(2) by Richard Sanzo. (Hasson, James)
March 20, 2024 Filing 8 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Brian McEwing. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. Counsel may need to link their CM/ECF account to their upgraded individual pacer account. Instructions on how to link CM/ECF accounts to upgraded pacer account can be found at # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-current-pacer-accounts.htm#link-account. (McManus, Caetlin)
March 20, 2024 Filing 7 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Mary Elisa Reeves. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. Counsel may need to link their CM/ECF account to their upgraded individual pacer account. Instructions on how to link CM/ECF accounts to upgraded pacer account can be found at # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-current-pacer-accounts.htm#link-account. (McManus, Caetlin)
March 20, 2024 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Brian McEwing, Esq. Filing fee: $ 125, receipt number AMADC-10327096 by Atlantic Capes Fisheries, Inc., Atlantic Harvesters, LLC, F/V Enterprise, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Blatchley, Samuel)
March 20, 2024 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Mary Elisa Reeves, Esq. Filing fee: $ 125, receipt number AMADC-10327079 by Atlantic Capes Fisheries, Inc., Atlantic Harvesters, LLC, F/V Enterprise, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Blatchley, Samuel)
March 19, 2024 Filing 4 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by mail (Phillips, Sophie)
March 19, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael B. Flynn on behalf of Richard Sanzo (Flynn, Michael)
March 18, 2024 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Richard G. Stearns assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Kinsella, Jaylannie)
March 18, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by ATLANTIC CAPES FISHERIES, INC., ATLANTIC HARVESTERS, LLC, F/V ENTERPRISE, LLC [Filed prior to service of the Plaintiffs state court Complaint on any Defendant] ( Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number AMADC-10322181 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Category Form Local Category Form)(Blatchley, Samuel) Docket text modified on 3/21/2024 (McManus, Caetlin).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanzo v. Atlantic Capes Fisheries, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Sanzo
Represented By: James G Hasson, Jr
Represented By: Michael B. Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlantic Capes Fisheries, Inc.
Represented By: Samuel P. Blatchley
Represented By: Brian McEwing
Represented By: Mary Elisa Reeves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F/V Enterprise, LLC
Represented By: Samuel P. Blatchley
Represented By: Brian McEwing
Represented By: Mary Elisa Reeves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlantic Harvesters, LLC
Represented By: Samuel P. Blatchley
Represented By: Brian McEwing
Represented By: Mary Elisa Reeves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?