Healey v. AGA Service Company et al
Plaintiff: Patrick Healey
Defendant: AGA Service Company doing business as Allianz Worldwide Partners doing business as Allianz Global Assistance and Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2024cv10699
Filed: March 20, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Patti B Saris
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2024 Filing 18 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWED re #17 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint. ANSWER DUE BY 5/24/2024. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
May 10, 2024 Filing 17 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to May 24, 2024 to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by AGA Service Company.(Stein, Callan)
May 2, 2024 Filing 16 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Rex Sharp. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at # https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account. You must put the docket number under ADDITIONAL FILER INFORMATION on your form when registering or it will be rejected.Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm.A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
May 2, 2024 Filing 15 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Ruth Anne French-Hodson. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at # https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account. You must put the docket number under ADDITIONAL FILER INFORMATION on your form when registering or it will be rejected.Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm.A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
May 1, 2024 Filing 14 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Nathan Kakazu. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at # https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account. You must put the docket number under ADDITIONAL FILER INFORMATION on your form when registering or it will be rejected.Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm.A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
April 25, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE of Dismissal of Defendant Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company by Patrick Healey (Gardner, Joshua) Modified on 5/1/2024 (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde).
April 22, 2024 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Ruth Anne French-Hodson Filing fee: $ 125, receipt number AMADC-10378680 by Patrick Healey. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certification of Ruth Anne French-Hodson)(Gardner, Joshua)
April 22, 2024 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Rex Sharp Filing fee: $ 125, receipt number AMADC-10378659 by Patrick Healey. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certification of Rex Sharp)(Gardner, Joshua)
April 22, 2024 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Nathan Kakazu Filing fee: $ 125, receipt number AMADC-10378643 by Patrick Healey. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Nathan Kakazu)(Gardner, Joshua)
April 11, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas J. Rosenberg on behalf of Patrick Healey (Rosenberg, Nicholas)
April 11, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Ashleigh Bell on behalf of Patrick Healey (Bell, Ashleigh)
April 9, 2024 Filing 7 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered Allowed re #6 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. AGA Service Company, Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company ANSWER DUE BY to 5/13/2024. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
April 8, 2024 Filing 6 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to May 13, 2024 to Respond to Complaint by AGA Service Company, Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company.(Stein, Callan)
April 1, 2024 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Patrick Healey. AGA Service Company served on 3/22/2024, answer due 4/12/2024. Acknowledgement filed by Patrick Healey. (Bell, Ashleigh)
April 1, 2024 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Patrick Healey. Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company served on 3/22/2024, answer due 4/12/2024. Acknowledgement filed by Patrick Healey. (Bell, Ashleigh)
March 20, 2024 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to AGA Service Company, Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Kinsella, Jaylannie)
March 20, 2024 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Patti B. Saris assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Cook, Savannah)
March 20, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Allianz Gobal Risks US Insurance Company, AGA Service Company Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number AMADC-10326407 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Patrick Healey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Allianz Insurance Policy, #2 Exhibit B - Travel Health Advisory Update, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Category Form)(Gardner, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Healey v. AGA Service Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Healey
Represented By: Joshua W. Gardner
Represented By: Rex Sharp
Represented By: Ashleigh Bell
Represented By: Nathan Kakazu
Represented By: Nicholas J. Rosenberg
Represented By: Ruth Anne French-Hodson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AGA Service Company doing business as Allianz Worldwide Partners doing business as Allianz Global Assistance
Represented By: Callan G. Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company
Represented By: Callan G. Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?