Grafenberg v. Executive Consulting Group, LLC et al
Plaintiff: JESSIE GRAFENBERG
Defendant: EXECUTIVE CONSULTING GROUP, LLC dba ECG CONSULTANTS, Executive Consulting Group, LLC doing business as ECG Consultants, Siemens Medical Solutions USA, Inc., Gregg Glaser and Christopher Collins
Case Number: 1:2024cv11047
Filed: April 19, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: F Dennis Saylor
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2024 Filing 18 State Court Acknowledgment re #17 Case file sent to Suffolk County Superior Court. (Warnock, Douglas)
May 30, 2024 Filing 17 Case file sent to Suffolk County Superior Court. (de Oliveira, Flaviana)
May 30, 2024 Filing 16 Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ORDER entered. ORDER OF REMAND to the State Court. (de Oliveira, Flaviana)
May 30, 2024 Filing 15 Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered GRANTING #14 MOTION to Remand [UNOPPOSED] TO STATE COURT. (de Oliveira, Flaviana)
May 21, 2024 Filing 14 MOTION to Remand [UNOPPOSED] TO STATE COURT by Executive Consulting Group, LLC.(Saunders, Diane)
May 16, 2024 Filing 13 DECLARATION re #12 Opposition to Motion by Executive Consulting Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Saunders, Diane) (Attachment 1 replaced on 5/16/2024, detached from additional exhibit) (de Oliveira, Flaviana). Additional attachment(s) added on 5/16/2024: #2 Exhibit 2) (de Oliveira, Flaviana).
May 16, 2024 Filing 12 Opposition re #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Executive Consulting Group, LLC. (Saunders, Diane)
May 8, 2024 Filing 11 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Christopher Collins, Executive Consulting Group, LLC, Gregg Glaser, Siemens Medical Solutions USA, Inc..(Khorsand, Ali)
May 7, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Ali Khorsand on behalf of Executive Consulting Group, LLC (Khorsand, Ali)
May 2, 2024 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support re #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Jessie Grafenberg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Kavaja, Ilir)
May 2, 2024 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Jessie Grafenberg.(Kavaja, Ilir)
April 25, 2024 Filing 7 STATE COURT Record. (Saunders, Diane)
April 24, 2024 Filing 6 Refusal to Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge. . (Saunders, Diane)
April 22, 2024 Filing 5 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email (McManus, Caetlin)
April 22, 2024 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Cook, Savannah)
April 19, 2024 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by EXECUTIVE CONSULTING GROUP, LLC dba ECG CONSULTANTS. (Saunders, Diane)
April 19, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Diane M. Saunders on behalf of EXECUTIVE CONSULTING GROUP, LLC dba ECG CONSULTANTS (Saunders, Diane)
April 19, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by EXECUTIVE CONSULTING GROUP, LLC dba ECG CONSULTANTS ( Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number AMADC-10376008 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A , #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Saunders, Diane) (Attachments 1-3 replaced , Additional attachment(s) added on 4/22/2024: #4 Category Form) (McManus, Caetlin). Modified on 4/22/2024 to separate exhibits (McManus, Caetlin).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grafenberg v. Executive Consulting Group, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JESSIE GRAFENBERG
Represented By: Eric R. LeBlanc
Represented By: Ilir Kavaja
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EXECUTIVE CONSULTING GROUP, LLC dba ECG CONSULTANTS
Represented By: Diane M. Saunders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Executive Consulting Group, LLC doing business as ECG Consultants
Represented By: Diane M. Saunders
Represented By: Ali Khorsand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Siemens Medical Solutions USA, Inc.
Represented By: Ali Khorsand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregg Glaser
Represented By: Ali Khorsand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Collins
Represented By: Ali Khorsand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?