Fitzpatrick v. PureFacts Financial Solutions Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Scott F Fitzpatrick
Defendant: PureFacts Financial Solutions Inc., PureFacts (USA) Inc., Robert Madej and Gerard Daniels
Case Number: 1:2024cv11072
Filed: April 23, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Richard G Stearns
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2024 Filing 15 ANSWER to Counterclaim by Scott F Fitzpatrick.(Casey, Lawrence)
May 28, 2024 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by James E. Gallagher on behalf of Scott F Fitzpatrick (Gallagher, James)
May 28, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher J. Marino on behalf of Scott F Fitzpatrick (Marino, Christopher)
May 25, 2024 Filing 12 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered Defendants PureFacts Financial Solutions, Inc., PureFacts (USA), Inc., Robert Madej, and Gerard Daniels having answered plaintiff's complaint and PureFacts Financial Solutions, Inc. and PureFacts (USA), Inc. having asserted counterclaims against Scott Fitzpatrick, the court enters the following pretrial schedule:Initial disclosures required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) must be completed by 7/11/24; any additional motions to amend the pleadings and/or joinder of parties should be filed by 9/23/24. Without leave of court, the parties are permitted 30 interrogatories, 30 requests for admissions, and 30 document requests, to be served on the other party (not with the court) within 30 days of initial disclosures (by 8/12/24). The court expects responses to be made in thirty days, unless a request for additional time is granted. If all parties would like to participate in the court's mediation program, they must notify our docket clerk Caetlin McManus (617-748-9041) by 12/30/24 (or earlier if the parties would like to utilize mediation before incurring the expense of discovery). All fact discovery must be completed no later than 1/16/25. Dispositive Motions are due by 2/12/25, with Oppositions to dispositive motions due 3/4/25. Reply only with leave of court. If a party intends to utilize an expert, they must file a notice on the docket no later than 12/30/24, in order for the court to consider whether the expert is appropriate and, if so, to alter the existing schedule. (Zierk, Marsha)
May 24, 2024 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by PureFacts Financial Solutions Inc.. ( Siegal, Jack)
May 24, 2024 Filing 10 Defendants' ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Scott F Fitzpatrick by Robert Madej, PureFacts (USA) Inc., PureFacts Financial Solutions Inc., Gerard Daniels.( Siegal, Jack)
May 24, 2024 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Scott F Fitzpatrick. Robert Madej served on 5/11/2024, answer due 6/3/2024. Acknowledgement filed by Scott F Fitzpatrick. (Casey, Lawrence)
May 21, 2024 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by PureFacts (USA) Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Purefacts Financial Solutions, Inc. for PureFacts (USA) Inc... ( Siegal, Jack)
May 21, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas M Brown on behalf of PureFacts (USA) Inc. (Brown, Thomas)
May 21, 2024 Filing 6 Filed in error, re-filed correctly at ECF No. #7 . Modified on 5/21/2024 (McManus, Caetlin).
May 21, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jack I. Siegal on behalf of PureFacts (USA) Inc. ( Siegal, Jack)
May 20, 2024 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Scott F Fitzpatrick. Acknowledgement filed by Scott F Fitzpatrick. (Casey, Lawrence) Robert Madej served on 5/11/2024, answer due 6/1/2024.Gerard Daniels served on 5/6/2024, answer due 5/27/2024. PureFacts (USA) Inc.served on 5/6/2024, answer due 5/27/2024. PureFacts Financial Solutions, Inc.served on 5/6/2024, answer due 5/27/2024. Modified on 5/22/2024 to include dates served and answer due dates (McManus, Caetlin).
April 23, 2024 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Gerard Daniels, Robert Madej, PureFacts (USA) Inc., PureFacts Financial Solutions Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Horvath, Courtney)
April 23, 2024 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Richard G. Stearns assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Phillips, Sophie)
April 23, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number AMADC-10380329 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Scott F Fitzpatrick. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form, #3 PureFacts Financial Solutions Summons, #4 PureFacts (USA) Inc. Summons, #5 Robert Madej Summons, #6 Gerard Daniels Summons)(Casey, Lawrence)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fitzpatrick v. PureFacts Financial Solutions Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott F Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Lawrence J. Casey
Represented By: Christopher J. Marino
Represented By: James E. Gallagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PureFacts Financial Solutions Inc.
Represented By: Jack I. Siegal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PureFacts (USA) Inc.
Represented By: Jack I. Siegal
Represented By: Thomas M Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Madej
Represented By: Jack I. Siegal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerard Daniels
Represented By: Jack I. Siegal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?