Mone v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Plaintiff: Angelo Mone
Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Case Number: 1:2024cv11253
Filed: May 10, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Patti B Saris
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Keisha Blaise on behalf of Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. (Blaise, Keisha)
July 1, 2024 Filing 8 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Lapish, Caroline)
June 6, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of 16.b Scheduling Conference.This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the courtroom deputy of the session as soon as possible.Audio access to the hearing may be available to the media and public. Please check the #Court schedule. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html.For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the general orders and public notices of the Court available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. Scheduling Conference set for 7/10/2024 10:30 AM in Remote Proceeding before Judge Patti B. Saris. (mm)
May 17, 2024 Filing 6 STATE COURT Record. (Lapish, Caroline)
May 16, 2024 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc..(Lapish, Caroline)
May 10, 2024 Filing 4 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by mail (Phillips, Sophie)
May 10, 2024 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Lapish, Caroline)
May 10, 2024 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Patti B. Saris assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Paul G. Levenson. (Horvath, Courtney)
May 10, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. ( Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number AMADC-10411419 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Local Category Sheet, #3 Exhibit A - State Court Filings)(Lapish, Caroline)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mone v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angelo Mone
Represented By: Russell Luiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Caroline B. Lapish
Represented By: Keisha Blaise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?