Gillespie v. Patterson et al
Plaintiff: Vincent Gillespie
Defendant: Teri Patterson, Stephanie Lucas and Does 1 through 100
Case Number: 3:2007cv30060
Filed: April 13, 2007
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Office: Springfield Office
County: Hampden
Presiding Judge: Michael A Ponsor
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2007. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2007 Filing 14 Judge Michael A Ponsor : ORDER entered. JUDGMENT in favor of Defendants Teri Patterson, et al against Plaintiff Vincent Gillespie(Lindsay, Maurice)
October 26, 2007 Filing 13 Judge Michael A Ponsor : MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered: As follows; adopting #8 Report and Recommendations and dismissing case on the ground that venue is improper. See the attached memo and order for complete details. cc/cl (Lindsay, Maurice)
October 26, 2007 Civil Case Terminated. (Lindsay, Maurice)
October 24, 2007 Filing 12 Deft. Stephanie Lucas' RESPONSE to the #8 Report and Recommendations by Stephanie Lucas filed. (Finn, Mary)
October 17, 2007 Filing 11 Remark - Pltf's Errata Sheet to his #10 Objection to the #8 Report and Recommendation by Vincent Gillespie filed. (Finn, Mary)
October 16, 2007 Filing 10 Pltf's OBJECTION to the #8 Report and Recommendations by Vincent Gillespie filed. (Finn, Mary)
October 12, 2007 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #7 Response to Order to Show Cause filed by Vincent Gillespie Recommendation: "...For the reasons stated, the court hereby RECOMMENDS to the district judge to whom this case will be re-assigned that the action be DISMREPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #7 Response to Order to Show Cause filed by Vincent Gillespie Recommendation: "...For the reasons stated, the court hereby RECOMMENDS to the district judge to whom this case will be re-assigned that the action be DISM. Pltf's Objections to R&R due by 10/16/2007. (Finn, Mary)
October 12, 2007 Judge Michael A Ponsor : ENDORSED ORDER entered granting the Pltf's #9 Motion for Extension of Time to 10/16/2007 to file his objections to the report and recommendation; cc/cl. and Pltf. (Finn, Mary)
October 12, 2007 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: endorsement re: 09 motion to ext. time corrected because: entry was deleted and redone to put the correct date for Pltf's objections to the R & R - 10/16/2007. (Finn, Mary)
October 11, 2007 Filing 9 Pltf's MOTION for Extension of Time to October 18, 2007 to file his objections to the Report and Recommendation by Vincent Gillespie filed. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Vincent Gillespie)(Finn, Mary)
October 1, 2007 Remark: Clerk received telephone call from Vincent Gillespie re: deadline to file response to #8 Report and Recommendation. Mr. Gillespie indicated that the mail was delayed, as the wrong zip code was on the court's mailing label (clerk verified through the docket that the zip code was improperly on the docket sheet, reading 01027, rather than 01061), and requested confirmation re: response deadline. Clerk informed Mr. Gillespie that his response was not due until 10/11/07. (Healy, Bethaney)
October 1, 2007 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: Plaintiff's mailing address modified to reflect proper zip code (01061). (Healy, Bethaney)
September 21, 2007 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman. REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS with regard to #7 Response to Order to Show Cause filed by Vincent Gillespie ENTERED, cc:cl. Recommendation: "...For the reasons stated, the court hereby RECOMMENDS to the district judge to whom this case will be re-assigned that the action be DISMISSED without prejudice on grounds the venue is improper."Objections to R&R due by 10/11/2007(Healy, Bethaney)
September 21, 2007 Case reassigned to Judge Michael A Ponsor. Judge Kenneth P. Neiman no longer assigned to the case. (Healy, Bethaney)
September 13, 2007 Filing 7 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Vincent Gillespie. (Lindsay, Maurice)
August 31, 2007 Set/Reset Deadlines: Pltf's resp. to the #3 Order to Show Cause reset to 9/13/2007. (Finn, Mary)
August 31, 2007 Judge Kenneth P. Neiman : Electronic ORDER entered granting #6 Stephanie Lucas's Motion for Extension of Time to obtain counsel as follows: Ms. Lucas, if necessary, shall have thirty days from the court's ruling on Plaintiff's response to its order to show cause to obtain counsel. So ordered. (Neiman, Kenneth)
August 30, 2007 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to 30 days to obtain Counsel by Stephanie Lucas.(Lindsay, Maurice)
August 30, 2007 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to 9/13/07 to File Reply as to #3 Order to show cause by Vincent Gillespie. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit#2 Proposed Order)(Lindsay, Maurice)
August 30, 2007 Judge Kenneth P. Neiman : Electronic ORDER entered granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to September 13, 2007, to File Response to Order to Show Cause. There shall be no further extensions.(Neiman, Kenneth)
August 16, 2007 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER with Regard to Plaintiff's #2 Motion to Allow Service by Publication and Order to Show Cause, ENTERED, cc:cl. See Memorandum for details. (Healy, Bethaney)
August 15, 2007 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Vincent Gillespie. Stephanie Lucas served on 8/11/2007, answer due 8/31/2007. Acknowledgement filed by Vincent Gillespie. (Finn, Mary)
August 3, 2007 Filing 2 MOTION for Order Allowing Service by Publication and for extension of time to serve Defendant Ms. Teri Patterson by Vincent Gillespie. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D)(Lindsay, Maurice)
April 16, 2007 Summons Issued as to Teri Patterson, Stephanie Lucas, Does 1 through 100. (Healy, Bethaney)
April 16, 2007 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman. (Healy, Bethaney)
April 16, 2007 Remark: Consent form, summonses, LR 4.1 notice forwarded to Plaintiff. (Healy, Bethaney)
April 13, 2007 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Teri Patterson, Stephanie Lucas, Does 1 through 100 , filed by Vincent Gillespie. (Attachments: #1 Cover and Category Sheets)(Healy, Bethaney)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gillespie v. Patterson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Gillespie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teri Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Lucas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?