Crowther v. CSX Transportation, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Geoffrey Crowther
Defendant: CSX Transportation, Inc. and Consolidated Rail Corporation
Case Number: 3:2009cv10334
Filed: March 5, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Office: Springfield Office
County: Suffolk
Presiding Judge: Michael A Ponsor
Nature of Suit: Federal Employers Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 156 Judge Michael A. Ponsor: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER Regarding Defendants' Bill of Costs. In summary, because of Defendants failure to explain large portions of their request for costs, Defendants Bill of Costs (Dkt. No. 150 ) is ALLOWE D to the following extent: $160.05 for fees of the clerk, $479.00 for fees for service of summons and subpoena, and $4,183.80 for deposition transcripts. The Bill of Costs is DENIED in all other respects. See the attached memo and order for complete details. (Lindsay, Maurice)
February 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 129 Judge Michael A Ponsor: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW entered. As follows: Defendants motion for judgment as a matter of law (Dkt. No. 123) was ALLOWED as to Plaintiffs claims of injury to his knees and neck as well as Plaintiffs claims of aggravation of injury to his knees, elbow, and thumb. The motion was DENIED as to Plaintiffsclaim of injury to his elbow, thumb, and forearm. See the attached memo and order for complete details. Associated Cases: 3:09-cv-10334-MAP, 3:09-cv-11467-MAP(Lindsay, Maurice)
November 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 93 Judge Michael A Ponsor: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered. As follows: Plaintiffs request for reconsideration is hereby DENIED. The claim related to aggravation of degenerative arthritis in Plaintiffs neck was never included in Plaintiffs original complaint filed in Pennsylvania. The courts rationale for allowing summary judgment on this claim is still valid, and there is no reason to re-think the issue. See the attached memo and order for complete details. (Lindsay, Maurice)
October 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Judge Michael A Ponsor: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered. This case will proceed to a final pretrial conference and trial in accordance with the schedule previously established. See the attached memo and order for complete details. (Lindsay, Maurice)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crowther v. CSX Transportation, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geoffrey Crowther
Represented By: Thomas J. Joyce, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSX Transportation, Inc.
Represented By: Michael B. Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Consolidated Rail Corporation
Represented By: Michael B. Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?