Sustainable Sourcing, LLC v. Brandstorm, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: |
Sustainable Sourcing, LLC |
Defendant: |
Brandstorm, Inc., Brandstorm HBC, Inc. and Thierry Ollivier |
Case Number: |
3:2012cv30093 |
Filed: |
May 17, 2012 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Massachusetts |
Office: |
Springfield Office |
County: |
Berkshire |
Presiding Judge: |
Kenneth P. Neiman |
Nature of Suit: |
Copyrights |
Cause of Action: |
17 U.S.C. § 101 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
January 18, 2017 |
Filing
147
Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered. For the foregoing reasons, Pltf's Motion to Compel - 140 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Supplemental documents will be produced in compliance with this order by no later than 2/15/2017. A separate order shall issue related to the parties Joint Motion for Extension of Scheduling Order. (Finn, Mary)
|
May 31, 2016 |
Filing
133
Judge Michael A. Ponsor: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered. As follows: For the reasons stated, Defendants motion for summary judgment (Dkt. No. 112 ) is hereby ALLOWED as to Plaintiffs claims for injunctive relief regarding Counts I and II, and ALLOWED as to statutory damages and attorneys fees regarding Count I. Defendants motion is otherwise DENIED. Plaintiffs motion for summary judgment (Dkt. No. 114 ) is ALLOWED as to liability on Count I, is ALLOWED as to Count I and Count V of the counterclaim, and is DENIED as to Counts II, III, and IV of the counterclaim. Further proceedings will unfold in accordance with the agreed schedule. It is So Ordered. See the attached memo and order for complete details. (Lindsay, Maurice)
|
December 2, 2013 |
Filing
71
Judge Michael A. Ponsor: ENDORSED ORDER entered. approving 70 Recommendations for Scheduling Order. APPROVED and so ordered. A date and time for hearing on Defendants' motion to dismiss will be set as soon as Plaintiff's opposition is filed, so ordered. (Lindsay, Maurice)
|
November 20, 2013 |
Filing
69
Judge Michael A. Ponsor: ORDER RE: PROPOSED SCHEDULE entered. As follows: This court hereby orders counsel to submit a proposed schedule for completion ofpretrial proceedings no later than December 2, 2013. Failure to submit a schedule may result in default or dismissal. It is So Ordered. See the attached order for the complete details. (Lindsay, Maurice)
|
November 27, 2012 |
Filing
42
Judge Michael A. Ponsor: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered. As follows; The Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. No. 10 ) is hereby ALLOWED, in part, as to Counts II and III. The facts as set forth in the complaint do not support any claim against Defendants apart fr om the claim contained in Count I, which asserts copyright violation. The Motion to Dismiss is hereby DENIED, without prejudice, as to Count I. This ruling will permit counsel to pursue possible settlement of this case, and if necessary, jurisdiction al discovery. A schedule for this is set forth in the attached memo and order. The Motion to Strike (Dkt. No. 34 ) is hereby DENIED. Counsel will submit a joint report to the court no later than December 28, 2012 regarding efforts at resolution of this case. See the attached memo and order for complete details. (Lindsay, Maurice)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?