Excel Dryer, Inc. v. Dyson, Inc.
Plaintiff: |
Excel Dryer, Inc. |
Defendant: |
Dyson, Inc. |
Case Number: |
3:2012cv30211 |
Filed: |
December 5, 2012 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Massachusetts |
Office: |
Springfield Office |
County: |
Hampden |
Presiding Judge: |
Michael A. Ponsor |
Nature of Suit: |
Trademark |
Cause of Action: |
15 U.S.C. § 1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act) |
Jury Demanded By: |
Both |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 5, 2014 |
Filing
176
Judge Michael A. Ponsor: ENDORSED ORDER entered. granting 175 Letter/Request. Construed as a motion for extension, this is ALLOWED. Counsel will have until Sept. 15, 2014 to move to reopen this case, which was closed on June 27, 2014, if settlement is not completed. So ordered. (Lindsay, Maurice)
|
June 27, 2014 |
Filing
172
Judge Michael A. Ponsor: ENDORSED ORDER entered. re: 171 Letter/request (non-motion). Construed as a motion to reopen, this is ALLOWED. (Lindsay, Maurice)
|
February 4, 2014 |
Filing
152
Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered: As follows: For the reasons stated in the attached memo and order, the court ALLOWS Dysons 124 motion with respect to the subpoena duces tecum served on NSF by Excel and the depositi on subpoena served on Davison by Excel, EXCEPT as to the permitted discovery set forth in this memo and order. For the reasons previously explained, however, Dysons motion is DENIED without prejudice to the extent it seeks to limit Excels discovery requests of other third-parties. SO ORDERED. See the attached memo and order for complete details. (Lindsay, Maurice)
|
November 19, 2013 |
Filing
100
Judge Michael A. Ponsor: ENDORSED ORDER entered granting 98 Joint Motion to move status conference to a date consistent with amended schedule approved by the Court. ALLOWED. The clerk will re-schedule the status conference for some time after May 7, 2014, So ordered. (Lindsay, Maurice)
|
February 19, 2013 |
Filing
34
Judge Michael A. Ponsor: ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION entered. As follows; for the reasons set forth by the court in detail orally following argument, the Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Dkt. No. 2 ) was DENIED fro m the bench. The court has this day issued a Pretrial Scheduling Orderto govern the preliminary phase of this case over the next eight months, leading to a status conference to take place on December 4, 2013 at 2:00 p.m. See the attached order for complete details. (Lindsay, Maurice)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?