Karle v. Southwest Credit Systems et al
Plaintiff: |
Alexis Karle |
Defendant: |
Southwest Credit Systems, Northeast Utilities Service Company, Deca Financial Services LLC, EOS CCA and Credit Acceptance |
Case Number: |
3:2014cv30058 |
Filed: |
March 28, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Massachusetts |
Office: |
Springfield Office |
County: |
Hampden |
Presiding Judge: |
Kenneth P. Neiman |
Presiding Judge: |
Michael A. Ponsor |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Both |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 25, 2015 |
Filing
120
Judge Mark G. Mastroianni: ORDER entered adopting Report and Recommendations dkt 115 . Based upon the thorough analysis presented in the Report and Recommendation, and noting there are no objections, the court, upon de novo review, hereby ADOPTS th e Report and Recommendation. (Dkt. No. 115.) Based upon this, the summary judgment motions filed by Northeast and Credit Acceptance are hereby ALLOWED, (dkt 54 and 57) and Plaintiffs cross-motion for summary judgment (dkt 105) is hereby DENIED. (Pelegano, Theresa)
|
January 20, 2015 |
Filing
82
Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S 62 MOTION TO COMPEL AND DEFENDANT SOUTHWEST CREDIT SYSTEMS' 75 MOTION TO STRIKE, for the reasons stated, Plaintiff's Motion to Compe l Production of Documents or, in the Alternative, for an In Camera Inspection of Documents is DENIED, and Defendant Southwest Credit Systems' Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Plain tiff will have until February 4, 2015, to complete any remaining fact discovery, as indicated in the joint proposed scheduling order adopted by the court, and will then have twenty-one (21) days of additional time to file further opposition, if any, to Defendants' current pending summary judgment motions. The clerk shall adjust the filing date accordingly. See attached memorandum and order for complete details. (Calderon, Melissa)
|
April 29, 2014 |
Filing
18
Judge Michael A. Ponsor: ORDER entered. re 14 Suggestion of Bankruptcy/Notice of Automatic Stay. (Lindsay, Maurice)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?