United States of America v. $793,580 in United States currency seized on January 30, 2017 in Pittsfield, Massachusetts et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: one 2014 Ducati 1199 Panigale Motorcycle, bearing VIN ZDM14BPW5EB019383, $793,580 in United States currency seized on January 30, 2017 in Pittsfield, Massachusetts and one 2012 Audi A6 Prestige, bearing VIN: WAUHGAFC8CN152098
Claimant: Matthew Murray
Case Number: 3:2018cv30015
Filed: January 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Office: Springfield Office
County: Hampden
Presiding Judge: Mark G Mastroianni
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2018 Filing 11 US Marshal Process Receipt and Return for Warant and Monition, Verified Complaint and Affidivat. $793,580 in U.S. Currency Seized on January 30, 2017. served Delivered on 5/14/2018. - In UMSM Custody. (Finn, Mary)
May 16, 2018 Filing 10 US Marshal Process Receipt and Return for Warrant and Monition. $793580 seized on 1/30/17. Served Delivered on 5/14/18 (adminn, )
April 26, 2018 Filing 9 US Marshal Process Receipt and Return for Warrant and monition. one 2012 Audi A6 served Delivered on 4/26/18 (adminn, )
April 26, 2018 Filing 8 US Marshal Process Receipt and Return for Complaint. One 2014 Ducati 1199 served Delivered on 4/16/18 (adminn, )
April 19, 2018 Filing 7 Judge Mark G. Mastroianni: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #6 Assented to Motion to Stay Civil Forfeiture Action. This action is hereby STAYED without prejudice to either party moving to lift the stay based on future developments. (Lindsay, Maurice)
April 17, 2018 Filing 6 Assented to MOTION to Stay Civil Forfeiture Action by Matthew Murray.(Levchuk, Andrew)
April 6, 2018 Filing 5 WARRANT AND MONITION issued. (Bartlett, Timothy)
March 27, 2018 Filing 4 CLAIM by Matthew Murray. (Levchuk, Andrew)
January 29, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to $793,580 in United States currency seized on January 30, 2017 in Pittsfield, Massachusetts, one 2012 Audi A6 Prestige, bearing VIN: WAUHGAFC8CN152098, one 2014 Ducati 1199 Panigale Motorcycle, bearing VIN ZDM14BPW5EB019383. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Lindsay, Maurice)
January 29, 2018 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Mark G. Mastroianni assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson. (Lindsay, Maurice)
January 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Forfeiture In Rem against All Defendants (Fee Status: US Government), filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet and Categorey Form, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Text of Proposed Order Warrant and Monition)(Lazarus, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $793,580 in United States currency seized on January 30, 2017 in Pittsfield, Massachusetts et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: one 2014 Ducati 1199 Panigale Motorcycle, bearing VIN ZDM14BPW5EB019383
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $793,580 in United States currency seized on January 30, 2017 in Pittsfield, Massachusetts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: one 2012 Audi A6 Prestige, bearing VIN: WAUHGAFC8CN152098
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: David G. Lazarus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Matthew Murray
Represented By: Andrew G. Levchuk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?