United States of America v. O'Brien et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Jeannine C. O'Brien, People's United Bank, N.A., Town of South Hadley, Victor R. O'Brien, Jr., Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Hendel & Collins, P.C. and A. Boilard Sons, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv30112
Filed: July 13, 2018
Court: Massachusetts District Court
Office: Springfield Office
County: Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Katherine A Robertson
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7403
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 4, 2018 24 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference ISSUED: A Scheduling Conference is set for 10/9/2018 at 10:00 AM in Hampshire Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson. Joint Statement due by 10/2/2018. See attached Notice for complete details. (Calderon, Melissa)
August 31, 2018 23 ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint by A. Boilard Sons, Inc..(Phillips, Cornelius)
August 31, 2018 22 Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #21 Joint Motion Regarding Defendant Town of South Hadley's Participation in this Case. (Healy, Bethaney)
August 28, 2018 21 Joint MOTION Defendant Town of South Hadley's Participation in this Case by United States of America.(Bednar, Philip)
August 27, 2018 20 ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint by Jeannine C. O'Brien, Victor R. O'Brien, Jr. (Lindsay, Maurice)
August 23, 2018 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed People's United Bank, N.A. served on 8/21/2018, answer due 9/11/2018. (Bednar, Philip)
August 23, 2018 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed Town of South Hadley served on 8/6/2018, answer due 8/27/2018. (Bednar, Philip)
August 21, 2018 17 NOTICE by Commonwealth of Massachusetts (McAuliffe, Eileen)
August 17, 2018 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Eileen Ryan McAuliffe on behalf of Commonwealth of Massachusetts (McAuliffe, Eileen)
August 10, 2018 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed Commonwealth of Massachusetts served on 8/6/2018, answer due 8/27/2018. (Bednar, Philip)
August 10, 2018 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed A. Boilard Sons, Inc. served on 8/6/2018, answer due 8/27/2018. (Bednar, Philip)
August 10, 2018 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed Hendel & Collins, P.C. served on 8/6/2018, answer due 8/27/2018. (Bednar, Philip)
August 10, 2018 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed Jeannine C. O'Brien served on 8/6/2018, answer due 8/27/2018. (Bednar, Philip)
August 10, 2018 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed Victor R. O'Brien, Jr served on 8/6/2018, answer due 8/27/2018. (Bednar, Philip)
August 8, 2018 9 Summons Reissued as to A. Boilard Sons, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Nici, Richard)
August 2, 2018 10 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff to Appendix/Exhibit which was incorrectly filed in there Adobe Acrobat interactive format without being converted to PDF Format as required. This form has now been converted and replaced. (Figueroa, Tamara)
August 2, 2018 8 APPENDIX/EXHIBIT re #7 Amended Complaint Summons form for additional defendant by United States of America. (Bednar, Philip) (Main Document 8 replaced on 8/8/2018) (Figueroa, Tamara).
August 2, 2018 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by United States of America.(Bednar, Philip)
July 31, 2018 6 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff to Category Sheet which was incorrectly filed in there Adobe Acrobat interactive format without being converted to PDF Format as required. This form has now been converted and replaced. (Figueroa, Tamara)
July 31, 2018 5 Category Sheet re #1 Complaint,,, (category sheet only) by United States of America. (Bednar, Philip) (Main Document 5 replaced on 8/1/2018) (Figueroa, Tamara). Modified on 8/1/2018 (Figueroa, Tamara).
July 20, 2018 3 Summons Issued as to Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Hendel & Collins, P.C., Jeannine C. O'Brien, Victor R. O'Brien, Jr, People's United Bank, N.A., Town of South Hadley. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Healy, Bethaney)
July 20, 2018 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Healy, Bethaney)
July 13, 2018 4 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff to Civil Cover Sheet and Exhibits #2 -#8 which were incorrectly filed in its Adobe Acrobat interactive format without being converted to PDF Format as required. All forms have now been converted and replaced. (Figueroa, Tamara)
July 13, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Fee Status: US Government), filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Summons - Victor O'Brien, #3 Exhibit Summons - Jeannine O'Brien, #4 Exhibit Summons - People's United Bank, #5 Exhibit Summons - Hendel & Collins, #6 Exhibit Summons - Commonwealth of MA (Comm'r), #7 Exhibit Summons - Commonwealth of MA (AG), #8 Exhibit Summons - Town of South Hadley)(Bednar, Philip) (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/27/2018) (Figueroa, Tamara). (Attachment 2 replaced on 7/27/2018) (Figueroa, Tamara). (Attachment 3 replaced on 7/27/2018) (Figueroa, Tamara). (Attachment 4 replaced on 7/27/2018) (Figueroa, Tamara). (Attachment 5 replaced on 7/27/2018) (Figueroa, Tamara). (Attachment 6 replaced on 7/27/2018) (Figueroa, Tamara). (Attachment 7 replaced on 7/27/2018) (Figueroa, Tamara). (Attachment 8 replaced on 7/27/2018) (Figueroa, Tamara).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. O'Brien et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeannine C. O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: People's United Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of South Hadley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victor R. O'Brien, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commonwealth of Massachusetts
Represented By: Eileen Ryan McAuliffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hendel & Collins, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Boilard Sons, Inc.
Represented By: Cornelius W. Phillips, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Philip L. Bednar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?