Altman v. Berryhill

Plaintiff: Derrick Altman
Defendant: Acting Commissioner Nancy A. Berryhill and Nancy A. Berryhill
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2018cv30177
Filed: November 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Katherine A Robertson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2018 Filing 11 CONSENT by all parties to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Derrick Altman.. (Attachments: #1 cert of service)(Waldfogel, David)
November 27, 2018 Filing 10 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due for Nancy A. Berryhill 1/18/2019 due to the U.S. Attorney was served on 11/19/2018. (Finn, Mary)
November 27, 2018 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Derrick Altman. Acknowledgement filed by Derrick Altman., SUMMONS Returned Executed by Derrick Altman., SUMMONS Returned Executed as to US Attorney by Derrick Altman., SUMMONS Returned Executed by Derrick Altman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Sevice Social Security Admin with Cert Mail Return Receipt, #2 Exhibit Proof Of Service US Attorney with Cert Mail Return Receipt, #3 Exhibit Proof of Service Dep. Justice, Attorney General with Cert Mail Return Receipt)(Waldfogel, David)
November 22, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Hugh Dun Rappaport on behalf of Nancy A. Berryhill (Dun Rappaport, Hugh)
November 13, 2018 Filing 7 Online access to documents in this case is limited to counsel of record only. All documents are available for review in the Office of the Clerk. Counsel of record: please note that you will need to log into CM/ECF to access any documents in this case. (Alves-Baptista, Antonia)
November 13, 2018 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson: ORDER entered. Procedural Order re Social Security Action. (Finn, Mary)
November 13, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Nancy A. Berryhill. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Finn, Mary)
November 13, 2018 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Finn, Mary)
November 8, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Lindsay, Maurice) (Lindsay, Maurice).
November 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nancy A. Berryhill (Fee Status: IFP requested), filed by Derrick Altman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 In Forma Pauperis)(Waldfogel, David) (Attachment 2 replaced on 11/8/2018) (Lindsay, Maurice).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Altman v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Commissioner Nancy A. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Hugh Dun Rappaport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derrick Altman
Represented By: David Waldfogel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Christopher Michaels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?