Trustees of IBEW Local No. 7 Pension Fund and of the IBEW Local 7 Annuity Fund et al v. Springfield Electrical Co., Inc.
Plaintiff: Trustees of IBEW Local No. 7 Apprenticeship & Training Fund, Trustees of IBEW Local No. 7 Labor Management Cooperation Fund, Trustees of IBEW Local No. 7 Pension Fund and of the IBEW Local 7 Annuity Fund and IBEW Local No. 7
Defendant: Springfield Electrical Co., Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv30184
Filed: November 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Mark G Mastroianni
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 29:1451
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2019 Filing 7 Request for notice of default by IBEW Local No. 7, Trustees of IBEW Local No. 7 Apprenticeship & Training Fund, Trustees of IBEW Local No. 7 Labor Management Cooperation Fund, Trustees of IBEW Local No. 7 Pension Fund and of the IBEW Local 7 Annuity Fund . (Jackson, Colby)
January 2, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Colby J. Jackson on behalf of IBEW Local No. 7, Trustees of IBEW Local No. 7 Apprenticeship & Training Fund, Trustees of IBEW Local No. 7 Labor Management Cooperation Fund, Trustees of IBEW Local No. 7 Pension Fund and of the IBEW Local 7 Annuity Fund (Jackson, Colby)
December 13, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed Springfield Electrical Co., Inc. served on 12/7/2018, answer due 12/28/2018. (Landry, Thomas)
November 21, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Springfield Electrical Co., Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Lindsay, Maurice)
November 21, 2018 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Mark G. Mastroianni assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson. (Lindsay, Maurice)
November 21, 2018 Filing 2 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. The complaint (Dkt. No. 1) have been edited because the attached civil cover and category sheets were incorrectly filed in its original fillable/interactive format without being converted to pdf as required. Under our CM/ECF Procedures all fillable forms must be converted to pdf before they are filed, the unconverted forms have been converted and replaced with converted copies. (Lindsay, Maurice)
November 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Springfield Electrical Co., Inc. Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7419862 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by IBEW Local No. 7, Trustees of IBEW Local No. 7 Apprenticeship & Training Fund, Trustees of IBEW Local No. 7 Labor Management Cooperation Fund, Trustees of IBEW Local No. 7 Pension Fund and of the IBEW Local 7 Annuity Fund. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Landry, Thomas) (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/21/2018) (Lindsay, Maurice). (Attachment 2 replaced on 11/21/2018) (Lindsay, Maurice).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trustees of IBEW Local No. 7 Pension Fund and of the IBEW Local 7 Annuity Fund et al v. Springfield Electrical Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of IBEW Local No. 7 Apprenticeship & Training Fund
Represented By: Thomas R. Landry
Represented By: Colby J. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of IBEW Local No. 7 Labor Management Cooperation Fund
Represented By: Thomas R. Landry
Represented By: Colby J. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of IBEW Local No. 7 Pension Fund and of the IBEW Local 7 Annuity Fund
Represented By: Thomas R. Landry
Represented By: Colby J. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IBEW Local No. 7
Represented By: Thomas R. Landry
Represented By: Colby J. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Springfield Electrical Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?