Moore v. British Airways PLC
Plaintiff: Jennifer Moore
Defendant: British Airways PLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv30007
Filed: January 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Mark G Mastroianni
Referring Judge: Katherine A Robertson
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Anthony U. Battista Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7579085 by British Airways PLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Greeley, Christopher)
March 12, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Marissa N. Lefland Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7579006 by British Airways PLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Greeley, Christopher)
March 11, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re #7 Notice of Scheduling Conference SET FOR 4/3/2019 - the conference will still go forward before Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson. Judge Mark G. Mastroianni is the pending judge in the case now and Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson is the referral judge. (Finn, Mary)
March 11, 2019 Filing 11 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson for full pretrial case management, not including dispositive motions, for a Rule 16 scheduling conference. (Finn, Mary)
March 11, 2019 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Re-Assignment. Judge Mark G. Mastroianni assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson. (Finn, Mary)
March 11, 2019 Filing 9 Refusal to Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge. . (Chrisanthopoulos, Kevin)
March 7, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Notification forms indicating whether or not a party has consented to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge have not been received in the Clerk's Office. The submission of the form is mandatory. Completed forms shall be filed on or before the close of business on March 21, 2019. Additional forms can be obtained on the Court's web page at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov. (Calderon, Melissa)
March 6, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 4/3/2019 11:30 PM in Hampshire Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson. Joint Statement due by 3/27/2019.(Finn, Mary)
March 5, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by British Airways PLC.(Greeley, Christopher)
February 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher J. Greeley on behalf of British Airways PLC (Greeley, Christopher)
February 14, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Owen P. McGowan on behalf of British Airways PLC (McGowan, Owen)
January 22, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to British Airways PLC. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Lindsay, Maurice)
January 22, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Lindsay, Maurice) (Lindsay, Maurice).
January 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against British Airways PLC Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7501557 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Jennifer Moore. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Avtion Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Category Sheet)(Chrisanthopoulos, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. British Airways PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: British Airways PLC
Represented By: Christopher J. Greeley
Represented By: Owen P. McGowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Moore
Represented By: Kevin Chrisanthopoulos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?