Baker v. Smith & Wesson Corp.
Plaintiff: Earl Donald Baker
Defendant: Smith & Wesson Corp
Case Number: 3:2019cv30008
Filed: January 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Mark G Mastroianni
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 29:651
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2019 Filing 41 Judge Mark G. Mastroianni: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING Plaintiff's Motion for Extension #39 . Based on the history of this case, the court finds there is good cause to reschedule the initial scheduling conference and delay entry of a scheduling order. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b)(2). As a result, Plaintiff's motion is ALLOWED. A separate order will issue resetting the date of the initial scheduling conference. (Lindsay, Maurice)
March 5, 2019 Filing 40 Judge Mark G. Mastroianni: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #38 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. ALLOWED. Added John Y. Lee. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Lindsay, Maurice)
March 4, 2019 Filing 39 MOTION for Extension of Time to 4/4/2019 to Case Preparation by Earl Donald Baker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E)(Rudolf, Benjamin)
March 4, 2019 Filing 38 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of John Y. Lee Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7566123 by Earl Donald Baker. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certification of John Y. Lee in support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Rudolf, Benjamin)
March 1, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin C. Rudolf on behalf of Earl Donald Baker (Rudolf, Benjamin)
February 15, 2019 Filing 36 Judge Mark G. Mastroianni: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #35 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added. ALLOWED. Connie N. Bertram, Esq.. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Lindsay, Maurice)
February 13, 2019 Filing 35 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Connie N. Bertram Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7538038 by Smith & Wesson Corp. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Poindexter, Jeffrey)
February 6, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference ISSUED. Scheduling Conference set for 3/14/2019 AT 11:30 AM in Franklin Courtroom before Judge Mark G. Mastroianni. See Notice for Details. (Rivera, Christina)
February 4, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth S. Zuckerman on behalf of Smith & Wesson Corp (Zuckerman, Elizabeth)
February 4, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren C. Ostberg on behalf of Smith & Wesson Corp (Ostberg, Lauren)
February 4, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey E. Poindexter on behalf of Smith & Wesson Corp (Poindexter, Jeffrey)
January 23, 2019 Filing 30 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Mark G. Mastroianni assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson. (Danieli, Chris)
January 23, 2019 Filing 29 Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:18-cv-03847.
January 23, 2019 Filing 28 TRANSFERRED to the USDC Massachusetts, Springfield Division the electronic record. (bg, )
January 22, 2019 Filing 27 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order signed by the Honorable Edmond E. Chang. For the reasons stated in the Opinion, Defendant's motion 11 to transfer is granted. The Court finds that the proper forum under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) is the District of Massachusetts, where all the underlying events happened. The Clerk of the Court shall transfer this case forthwith to the District of Massachusetts, Springfield Division. Emailed notice(slb, )
December 19, 2018 Filing 26 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: The Court will post an order on the motion 11 to transfer in the upcoming weeks. The status hearing of 12/20/2018 is vacated. Emailed notice (eec)
October 5, 2018 Filing 25 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: The Court has the motion 11 to transfer under advisement. The status hearing of 10/09/2018 is reset to 12/20/2018 at 9:30 AM.Emailed notice (slb, )
August 21, 2018 Filing 24 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: In light of the fully briefed transfer motion 11 , the status hearing of 08/22/2018 is reset to 10/09/2018 at 9:00 AM.Emailed notice (slb, )
August 3, 2018 Filing 23 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Defendant's unopposed extension motion 19 to answer is granted to 08/01/2018, so the answer is accepted.Emailed notice (slb, )
August 1, 2018 Filing 22 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Smith & Wesson Corp.(Weinstein, Alex)
August 1, 2018 Filing 21 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Smith & Wesson Corp. (Weinstein, Alex)
July 31, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE of Motion by Alex Chad Weinstein for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer 19 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 8/6/2018 at 08:30 AM. (Weinstein, Alex)
July 31, 2018 Filing 19 MOTION by Defendant Smith & Wesson Corp. for extension of time to file answer (CONSENT MOTION) (Weinstein, Alex)
July 30, 2018 Filing 18 REPLY by Defendant Smith & Wesson Corp. TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO TRANSFER (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Weinstein, Alex)
July 19, 2018 Filing 17 RESPONSE by Earl Donald Bakerin Opposition to MOTION by Defendant Smith & Wesson Corp. to transfer case 11 /s/ John Y. Lee (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Response Exhibit A, # 2 Supplement Supplement to Declaration, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit I, # 12 Exhibit Response Exhibit B, # 13 Appendix Appendix A, # 14 Notice of Filing Notice of Filing)(Lee, John)
July 16, 2018 Filing 16 Rule 26(f) Report for Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) , filed by Defendant Smith & Wesson Corp.. (Bertram, Connie)
July 16, 2018 Filing 15 Rule 26(f) Report for Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) /s/ John Y. Lee, filed by Plaintiff Earl Donald Baker. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Filing) (Lee, John)
July 2, 2018 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: On Defendant's motion 11 to transfer under 28 U.S.C. 1404, Plaintiff's response is due by 07/19/2018. Defendant's reply is due by 07/30/2018. In light of the motion, MIDP disclosures are suspended, but Defendant still does have to file an answer by 07/31/2018 (even if the case is transferred, that is inevitable). The initial status hearing of 07/19/2018 is reset to 08/22/2018 at 10:00 a.m. Emailed notice (slb, )
July 2, 2018 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Application by Connie N. Bertram to appear pro hac vice 10 on behalf of Defendant is granted.Emailed notice (slb, )
June 28, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Motion by Alex Chad Weinstein for presentment of motion to transfer case 11 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 7/5/2018 at 08:30 AM. (Weinstein, Alex)
June 28, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION by Defendant Smith & Wesson Corp. to transfer case (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Weinstein, Alex)
June 28, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-14644605. (Bertram, Connie)
June 21, 2018 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Smith & Wesson Corp. by Alex Chad Weinstein (Weinstein, Alex)
June 20, 2018 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Earl Donald Baker. Earl Donald Baker waiver sent on 6/1/2018, answer due 7/31/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Filing Notice of Filing)(Lee, John)
June 18, 2018 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Count 2 is voluntarily dismissed, under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i), per R. 6. Mailed notice (mw, )
June 18, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Earl Donald Baker /s/ John Y. Lee (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Filing Notice of Filing)(Lee, John)
June 5, 2018 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE (Lee, John) (Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office) Modified on 6/6/2018 (pk, ).
June 4, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (pk, )
June 4, 2018 Filing 3 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Initial status hearing set for 07/19/2018 at 10:00 a.m. The parties must file a joint initial status report with the content described in the attached status report requirements at least 3 business days before the initial status hearing. Plaintiff must still file the report even if not all Defendants have been served or have responded to requests to craft a joint report. Because the Procedures are occasionally revised, counsel must read them anew even if counsel has appeared before Judge Chang in other cases. Emailed notice (Attachments: # 1 Status Report Requirements) (slb, )
June 1, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Edmond E. Chang. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Daniel G. Martin. (dal, )
June 1, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Lee, John)
June 1, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT /s/ John Y. Lee filed by Earl D Baker; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-14538618.(Lee, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baker v. Smith & Wesson Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earl Donald Baker
Represented By: John Yo-Hwan Lee
Represented By: Benjamin C. Rudolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith & Wesson Corp
Represented By: Alex Chad Weinstein
Represented By: Connie N. Bertram
Represented By: Jeffrey E. Poindexter
Represented By: Lauren C. Ostberg
Represented By: Elizabeth S. Zuckerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?