Cossette v. Costco Wholesale Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Janet Cossette
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Membership, Inc. and Costco Wholesale Corporation
Case Number: 3:2019cv30046
Filed: April 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Mark G Mastroianni
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 18 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Costco Wholesale Corporation, filed by Janet Cossette.(Healy, Bethaney)
June 28, 2019 Filing 17 Judge Mark G. Mastroianni: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #14 Motion to Amend Complaint (Healy, Bethaney)
June 27, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Mario D. Nimock on behalf of Costco Wholesale Membership, Inc. (Nimock, Mario)
June 27, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Mario D. Nimock on behalf of Costco Wholesale Corporation (Nimock, Mario)
June 27, 2019 Filing 14 Assented to MOTION to Amend Complaint Remove Costco Wholesale Membership, Inc. by Janet Cossette.(Cava, Christopher)
June 21, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Natasha S. Vedananda (Vedananda, Natasha)
June 19, 2019 Filing 12 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Mark G. Mastroianni: Scheduling Conference held on 6/19/2019. Present: Atty C. Cava for pltf, Atty Vedananda for defts. Court adopts scheduling recommendations, issues scheduling. Order to follow. (Court Reporter: Sarah Mubarek, Philbin & Assoc., sarahmubarek@comcast.net.) (Bartlett, Timothy)
June 19, 2019 Filing 11 First CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Janet Cossette.(Cava, Christopher)
June 18, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 . (Vedananda, Natasha)
June 12, 2019 Filing 9 First JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference . (Vedananda, Natasha)
May 16, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference ISSUED. Scheduling Conference set for 6/19/2019 at 3:00 PM in Franklin Courtroom before Judge Mark G. Mastroianni. See Notice for details. (Rivera, Christina)
May 10, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Costco Wholesale Corporation, Costco Wholesale Membership, Inc..(Vedananda, Natasha)
May 10, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Costco Wholesale Corporation, Costco Wholesale Membership, Inc.. (Vedananda, Natasha)
April 25, 2019 Filing 5 STATE COURT Record All Defendants.. (Vedananda, Natasha)
April 19, 2019 Filing 4 Remark: Emailed A Certified copy of the Notice of Removal today to Defendants Counsel for service on the State Court in order to obtain the certified State Court record. (Lindsay, Maurice)
April 19, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Mark G. Mastroianni assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson. (Lindsay, Maurice)
April 18, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher G. Betke on behalf of Costco Wholesale Corporation, Costco Wholesale Membership, Inc. (Betke, Christopher)
April 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Costco Wholesale Corporation, Costco Wholesale Membership, Inc. ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7627921 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Superior Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Superior Court Civil Action Cover Sheet, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Action Cover Sheet, #4 Category Form)(Vedananda, Natasha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cossette v. Costco Wholesale Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Membership, Inc.
Represented By: Natasha S. Vedananda
Represented By: Christopher G. Betke
Represented By: Mario D. Nimock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corporation
Represented By: Natasha S. Vedananda
Represented By: Christopher G. Betke
Represented By: Mario D. Nimock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Cossette
Represented By: Jennifer Lee Cava
Represented By: Christopher F. Cava
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?