Torres v. BayState Health Inc.
Plaintiff: Aleyda Torres
Defendant: BayState Health Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv30049
Filed: April 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Katherine A Robertson
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2020 Filing 44 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Chrisanthopoulos, Kevin)
February 26, 2020 Filing 43 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Chrisanthopoulos, Kevin)
February 25, 2020 Filing 42 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
February 25, 2020 Filing 41 Transcript of Motion to Dismiss held on January 30, 2020, before Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson. The Transcript may be purchased through Judy Bond at judy@bondcourtreporting.com, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. No Reporter Used. Digital Recording transcribed by Judy Bond. Redaction Request due 3/17/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/27/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/26/2020. (Scalfani, Deborah)
January 31, 2020 Filing 40 Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered finding as moot the defendant's #11 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim in light of the amended complaint filed as docket entry 27, and the defendant's motion to dismiss the amended complaint at docket number 33. (Robertson, Katherine)
January 30, 2020 Filing 39 Motions Taken Under Advisement: #33 MOTION to Dismiss. (Rivera, Melissa)
January 30, 2020 Filing 38 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson: Motion Hearing held on 1/30/2020 re #33 MOTION to Dismiss. Attorneys Present: Kevin Chrisanthopoulos, Daniel S. Marvin and Tory A. Weigand. Colloquy held with counsel regarding subject matter jurisdiction. The parties are to file briefs, as discussed in open court, by no later than 2/28/2020. Arguments heard on the pending motion. This matter is taken under advisement. Order to issue. (Court Reporter: Digital Recording. To order a copy of this Digital Recording, please go to #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/Magistrate-Audio.htm . For a transcript of this proceeding, contact Deborah Scalfani by email at deborah_scalfani@mad.uscourts.gov.) (Rivera, Melissa)
January 17, 2020 Filing 37 REPLY to Response to #33 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Re: Amended Complaint filed by BayState Health Inc.. (Marvin, Daniel)
January 3, 2020 Filing 36 Opposition re #33 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Re: Amended Complaint filed by Aleyda Torres. (Chrisanthopoulos, Kevin)
November 26, 2019 Filing 35 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. The motion to dismiss (Dkt. No. #33 ) has been edited because the memo in support was incorrectly filed as an attachment to the motion. The memorandum in support is not an acceptable attachment, The CM/ECF procedures require that the memo in support must be docketed separately and identified accordingly with a separate docket number, the memorandum have been removed and re-docketed separately. See (Dkt. No. #34 ) (Lindsay, Maurice)
November 25, 2019 Filing 34 MEMORANDUM in Support of Defendant's #33 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Re: Amended Complaint filed by BayState Health Inc. (Lindsay, Maurice)
November 25, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Re: Amended Complaint ( Responses due by 12/9/2019) by BayState Health Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities)(Marvin, Daniel)
October 22, 2019 Filing 32 Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting for the reasons stated in court #28 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed with Amended Complaint and Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiff's Motion. (Robertson, Katherine)
October 17, 2019 Filing 31 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson: Motion Hearing held on 10/17/2019 re Plaintiff's #28 MOTION for Leave to Proceed with #27 Amended Complaint. Attorneys Present: Kevin Chrisanthopoulos, Daniel S. Marvin and Tory A. Weigand. Counsel heard on the Motion. Plaintiff's Motion was ALLOWED, for the reasons stated in open court. Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the Amended Complaint in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint will be filed by no later than 11/25/2019; the Opposition shall be filed by 1/3/2020; and the Reply, if any, shall be filed by no later than 1/17/2020. A Motion Hearing is set for 1/30/2020 at 11:00 AM in Hampshire Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson. (Court Reporter: Digital Recording. To order a copy of this Digital Recording, please go to #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/Magistrate-Audio.htm . For a transcript of this proceeding, contact Deborah Scalfani by email at deborah_scalfani@mad.uscourts.gov.) (Rivera, Melissa)
October 15, 2019 Filing 30 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #28 MOTION to Amend #27 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint filed by BayState Health Inc.. (Marvin, Daniel)
October 3, 2019 Filing 29 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Plaintiff's #28 MOTION for Leave to Proceed with #27 Amended Complaint ISSUED: Motion Hearing set for 10/17/2019 at 11:00 AM in Hampshire Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson. The motion hearing on Defendant's motion to dismiss is converted to a motion hearing on Plaintiff's motion seeking leave to proceed with the amended complaint. Defendant's opposition, if any, shall be filed on or before the close of business on 10/15/2019. (Rivera, Melissa)
October 2, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION to Amend #27 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint by Aleyda Torres.(Chrisanthopoulos, Kevin)
September 12, 2019 Filing 27 AMENDED COMPLAINT against BayState Health Inc., filed by Aleyda Torres.(Chrisanthopoulos, Kevin)
August 23, 2019 Filing 26 REPLY to Response to #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by BayState Health Inc.. (Marvin, Daniel)
August 21, 2019 Filing 25 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . Motion Hearing reset to 10/17/2019 11:00 AM in Hampshire Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson. (Finn, Mary)
August 21, 2019 Filing 24 Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting the Defendant's Assented to #23 Motion to Continue the 10/10/2019 Hearing on the Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Motion to Dismiss Hearing continued to 10/17/2019 at 11:00 A.M. (Finn, Mary)
August 20, 2019 Filing 23 Consent MOTION to Continue Oral Argument to October 17, 2019 by BayState Health Inc..(Marvin, Daniel)
August 13, 2019 Filing 22 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . Defendant's Reply Brief due by 8/23/2019. Plaintiff's Sur-reply Brief, if any, due by 9/13/2019. Motion Hearing reset to 10/10/2019 11:00 AM in Hampshire Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson. (Finn, Mary)
August 13, 2019 Filing 21 Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting the Defendant's Assented to #20 Motion for Leave to File a Reply Brief and for the Plaintiff to file a Sur-reply Brief re: [11[ MOTION to Dismiss; granting #20 Motion to Continue the 8/27/2019 MOTION to Dismiss Hearing. Defendant's Reply Brief due by 8/23/2019, Plaintiff's Sur-Reply Brief, if any, due 9/13/2019. The MOTION to Dismiss Hearing is continued to 10/10/2019 at 11:00 A.M. (Finn, Mary)
August 12, 2019 Filing 20 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss. and MOTION to Continue/ Adjourn Oral Argument Date by BayState Health Inc..(Marvin, Daniel). Added an additional relief - MOTION to Continue on 8/13/2019 (Finn, Mary).
July 30, 2019 Filing 19 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Defendant's #11 MOTION to Dismiss ISSUED: A Motion Hearing is set for 8/27/2019 at 11:00 AM in Hampshire Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson. (Rivera, Melissa)
July 29, 2019 Filing 18 Opposition re #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Aleyda Torres. (Chrisanthopoulos, Kevin)
July 1, 2019 Filing 17 Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting the Plaintiff's Assented to #16 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . Plaintiff's response due by 7/29/2019. (Finn, Mary)
June 28, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to 07/29/2019 to File Response/Reply by Aleyda Torres.(Chrisanthopoulos, Kevin)
June 25, 2019 Filing 15 CONSENT by all parties to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Aleyda Torres.. (Chrisanthopoulos, Kevin)
June 17, 2019 Filing 14 Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Paul G. Karlsgodt. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. . (Finn, Mary)
June 17, 2019 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Daniel S. Marvin in Support re #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by BayState Health Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Baystate Health Privacy Policy)(Marvin, Daniel)
June 17, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support re #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by BayState Health Inc.. (Marvin, Daniel)
June 17, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ( Responses due by 7/1/2019) by BayState Health Inc..(Marvin, Daniel)
June 17, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Paul Karlsgodt Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7734717 by BayState Health Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Paul Karlsgodt)(Marvin, Daniel)
June 12, 2019 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Notification forms indicating whether or not a party has consented to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge have not been received in the Clerk's Office. The submission of the form is mandatory. Completed forms shall be filed on or before the close of business on June 26, 2019. Additional forms can be obtained on the Court's web page at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov. (Calderon, Melissa)
June 5, 2019 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Daniel S. Marvin. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. . (Finn, Mary)
June 4, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Daniel S. Marvin Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7715895 by BayState Health Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Daniel S. Marvin)(Weigand, Tory)
June 4, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Tory A. Weigand on behalf of BayState Health Inc. (Weigand, Tory)
May 2, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed All Defendants. (Chrisanthopoulos, Kevin)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 General Order 09-1, dated January 6, 2009 regarding the E-Government Act and Personal Identifiers entered. (Lindsay, Maurice)
April 12, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to BayState Health Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Lindsay, Maurice)
April 12, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Lindsay, Maurice) (Lindsay, Maurice).
April 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BayState Health Inc. Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7633465 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Aleyda Torres. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Chrisanthopoulos, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Torres v. BayState Health Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BayState Health Inc.
Represented By: Daniel S. Marvin
Represented By: Paul G. Karlsgodt
Represented By: Tory A. Weigand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aleyda Torres
Represented By: Kevin Chrisanthopoulos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?