Dailida et al v. Recovery Zone, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Melissa Dailida and Anthony Dailida
Defendant: Santander Consumer USA, Inc. d/b/a Chrysler Capital, Recovery Zone, Inc. and Santander Consumer USA, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv30065
Filed: May 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Mark G Mastroianni
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Settlement by All Plaintiffs (Korth, Sebastian)
July 3, 2019 Filing 10 Judge Mark G. Mastroianni: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time. (Bartlett, Timothy)
July 2, 2019 Filing 9 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to July 16, 2019 to Respond to Complaint by Santander Consumer USA, Inc..(Grant, Michael)
June 5, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael T. Grant on behalf of Santander Consumer USA, Inc. (Grant, Michael)
June 3, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph M. Noone on behalf of Recovery Zone, Inc. (Noone, Joseph)
May 29, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed Recovery Zone, Inc. served on 5/22/2019, answer due 6/12/2019. (Korth, Sebastian)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 General Order 09-1, dated January 6, 2009 regarding the E-Government Act and Personal Identifiers entered. (Lindsay, Maurice)
May 10, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Recovery Zone, Inc., Santander Consumer USA, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Lindsay, Maurice)
May 10, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Recovery Zone, Inc., Santander Consumer USA, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Lindsay, Maurice)
May 10, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Mark G. Mastroianni assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson. (Lindsay, Maurice)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7677016 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Anthony Dailida, Melissa Dailida. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Case Category Sheet)(Korth, Sebastian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dailida et al v. Recovery Zone, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santander Consumer USA, Inc. d/b/a Chrysler Capital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Recovery Zone, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph M. Noone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santander Consumer USA, Inc.
Represented By: Michael T. Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Dailida
Represented By: Sebastian N. Korth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Dailida
Represented By: Sebastian N. Korth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?