Meck v. CentiMark Corporation
Plaintiff: Michael Meck
Defendant: CentiMark Corporation
Case Number: 3:2019cv30070
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Mark G Mastroianni
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:754
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion re #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by CentiMark Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Landon Connolly)(Hanaka, Philip)
June 24, 2019 Filing 15 STATE COURT Record. (Hanaka, Philip)
June 19, 2019 Filing 14 Judge Mark G. Mastroianni: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Jaime S. Tuite. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Rivera, Christina)
June 18, 2019 Filing 13 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. The motion to extend time (Dkt. No. 9) and the motion to remand (Dkt. No. 11) were both edited because the they were not signed. The unsigned originals have been substituted with signed copies. (Lindsay, Maurice)
June 14, 2019 Filing 12 Opposition re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Michael Meck. (Herold, Suzanne)
June 14, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Michael Meck.(Herold, Suzanne) (Main Document 11 replaced on 6/18/2019) (Lindsay, Maurice).
June 11, 2019 Filing 10 Judge Mark G. Mastroianni: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Dismiss. (Rivera, Christina)
June 10, 2019 Filing 9 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to June 14, 2019 to File Opposition to Motion to Dismiss by Michael Meck.(Herold, Suzanne) (Main Document 9 replaced on 6/18/2019) (Lindsay, Maurice).
May 31, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by CentiMark Corporation. (Hanaka, Philip)
May 31, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by CentiMark Corporation.(Hanaka, Philip)
May 21, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Jaime S. Tuite Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7696093 by CentiMark Corporation.(Hanaka, Philip)
May 21, 2019 Filing 5 Remark: A Certified copy of the Notice of Removal has been sent via email today to Defendants Counsel for service on the State Court in order to obtain the certified State Court record. (Lindsay, Maurice)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 General Order 09-1, dated January 6, 2009 regarding the E-Government Act and Personal Identifiers entered. (Lindsay, Maurice)
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Mark G. Mastroianni assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson. (Lindsay, Maurice)
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CentiMark Corporation. (Hanaka, Philip)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CentiMark Corporation ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7693319 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Category Form for New Civil Cases)(Hanaka, Philip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meck v. CentiMark Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CentiMark Corporation
Represented By: Philip M. Hanaka
Represented By: Jaime S. Tuite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Meck
Represented By: Suzanne L. Herold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?