Perkins v. Heisecke et al
Plaintiff: John Perkins
Defendant: Ragha Vendra Kulkarni, Timothy Mahoney, William Buckenroth, Mario Flores, Berkshire Surgical Associates, Nestor Bond, Helen Clark, Vijiladevi Dhas, Sarah Gargus, Berkshire Medical Center, Inc., Jose Heisecke and United States
Case Number: 3:2019cv30084
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Katherine A Robertson
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Lynn I. Hu on behalf of John Perkins (Hu, Lynn)
August 15, 2019 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Support re #17 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by United States. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Meredith Torres)(Morgan, Christopher)
August 15, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by United States.(Morgan, Christopher)
August 14, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Travis J. Grefenstette on behalf of Berkshire Medical Center, Inc., Nestor Bond, William Buckenroth, Helen Clark, Sarah Gargus (Grefenstette, Travis)
August 13, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by William J. Fennell on behalf of Berkshire Surgical Associates (Fennell, William)
August 13, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by William J. Fennell on behalf of Jose Heisecke (Fennell, William)
August 2, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by A. Bernard Guekguezian on behalf of Vijiladevi Dhas (Guekguezian, A.)
August 1, 2019 Filing 13 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Attachment #1 (Dkt.11) was restricted because it contains personal identifying information which is not permitted pursuant to the Court's General Order 09-1 regarding the E-Government Act and Personal Identifiers. (Figueroa, Tamara)
August 1, 2019 Filing 11 STATE COURT Record. (Attachments: #1 State Court Record)(Morgan, Christopher)
August 1, 2019 Filing 10 Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #5 MOTION to Substitute the United States as Proper Party Defendant for Dr. Mario Flores. United States added. Dr. Mario Flores terminated. (Rivera, Melissa)
July 26, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca H. G. Capozzi on behalf of Ragha Vendra Kulkarni (Capozzi, Rebecca)
July 25, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Frederick P. Frangie on behalf of Timothy Mahoney (Frangie, Frederick)
July 22, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca L. Dalpe on behalf of Berkshire Medical Center, Inc., Nestor Bond, William Buckenroth, Helen Clark, Sarah Gargus (Dalpe, Rebecca)
July 11, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION to Substitute Party filed by Mario Flores. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Morgan, Christopher)
July 11, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Substitute Party by Mario Flores.(Morgan, Christopher)
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 Remark: A Certified copy of the Notice of Removal has been sent via email today to Defendants Counsel for service on the State Court in order to obtain the certified State Court record. (Lindsay, Maurice)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 General Order 09-1, dated January 6, 2009 regarding the E-Government Act and Personal Identifiers entered. (Lindsay, Maurice)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Lindsay, Maurice) (Lindsay, Maurice).
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Mario Flores ( Fee Status: US Government) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Category Form)(Morgan, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perkins v. Heisecke et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Perkins
Represented By: Andrew C. Meyer, Jr.
Represented By: Lynn I. Hu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ragha Vendra Kulkarni
Represented By: Rebecca H. G. Capozzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Mahoney
Represented By: Frederick P. Frangie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Buckenroth
Represented By: Travis J. Grefenstette
Represented By: Rebecca L. Dalpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mario Flores
Represented By: Christopher L. Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berkshire Surgical Associates
Represented By: William J. Fennell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nestor Bond
Represented By: Travis J. Grefenstette
Represented By: Rebecca L. Dalpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Helen Clark
Represented By: Travis J. Grefenstette
Represented By: Rebecca L. Dalpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vijiladevi Dhas
Represented By: A. Bernard Guekguezian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah Gargus
Represented By: Travis J. Grefenstette
Represented By: Rebecca L. Dalpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berkshire Medical Center, Inc.
Represented By: Travis J. Grefenstette
Represented By: Rebecca L. Dalpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Heisecke
Represented By: William J. Fennell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States
Represented By: Christopher L. Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?