Moreland et al v. Black Budda Associates, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Paola Canas, Rosa Acosta, Sara Underwood, Ursula Sanchez, Claudia Sampedro, Jessica Hinton, Brenda Lynn Geiger, Andra Cheri Moreland, Mariana Davalos, Rachel Bernstein, Irina Voronina, Katarina Van Derham and Ana Cheri
Defendant: Paul Ramesh and Black Budda Associates, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv30091
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Mark G Mastroianni
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of John V. Golaszewski Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7853339 by Rosa Acosta, Rachel Bernstein, Paola Canas, Mariana Davalos, Brenda Lynn Geiger, Jessica Hinton, Andra Cheri Moreland, Claudia Sampedro, Ursula Sanchez, Sara Underwood, Katarina Van Derham, Irina Voronina. (Attachments: #1 Attorney certification, #2 proposed order)(Sullivan, Paul)
August 28, 2019 Filing 10 Opposition re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with supporting memorandum of law filed by Rosa Acosta, Rachel Bernstein, Paola Canas, Mariana Davalos, Brenda Lynn Geiger, Jessica Hinton, Andra Cheri Moreland, Claudia Sampedro, Ursula Sanchez, Sara Underwood, Katarina Van Derham, Irina Voronina. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in support of opposition)(Sullivan, Paul)
August 15, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Paul Ramesh. (Kelly, Daniel)
August 15, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Paul Ramesh.(Kelly, Daniel)
August 15, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Paul Ramesh.(Kelly, Daniel)
August 15, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Black Budda Associates, LLC.(Kelly, Daniel)
August 1, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed Black Budda Associates, LLC served on 7/10/2019, answer due 7/31/2019. (Sullivan, Paul)
August 1, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed Paul Ramesh served on 7/12/2019, answer due 8/2/2019. (Sullivan, Paul)
July 5, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Healy, Bethaney)
July 5, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Mark G. Mastroianni assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson. (Healy, Bethaney)
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7759330 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Rosa Acosta, Rachel Bernstein, Paola Canas, Mariana Davalos, Brenda Lynn Geiger, Jessica Hinton, Andra Cheri Moreland, Claudia Sampedro, Ursula Sanchez, Sara Underwood, Katarina Van Derham, Irina Voronina. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - I, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Local category form)(Sullivan, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moreland et al v. Black Budda Associates, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paola Canas
Represented By: Paul V. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosa Acosta
Represented By: Paul V. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sara Underwood
Represented By: Paul V. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ursula Sanchez
Represented By: Paul V. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claudia Sampedro
Represented By: Paul V. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Hinton
Represented By: Paul V. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Lynn Geiger
Represented By: Paul V. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andra Cheri Moreland
Represented By: Paul V. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mariana Davalos
Represented By: Paul V. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Bernstein
Represented By: Paul V. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irina Voronina
Represented By: Paul V. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katarina Van Derham
Represented By: Paul V. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ana Cheri
Represented By: Paul V. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Ramesh
Represented By: Daniel D. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Black Budda Associates, LLC
Represented By: Daniel D. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?