The D.S. Brown Company v. White-Schiavone, JV et al
Plaintiff: The D.S. Brown Company
Defendant: White-Schiavone, JV, Huntsman Corporation, Schiavone Construction Co., LLC and J.F. White Contracting Co.
Case Number: 3:2019cv30095
Filed: July 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Katherine A Robertson
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2019 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by The D.S. Brown Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Miller, Jodi)
July 24, 2019 Filing 10 Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Mark Steiner. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Figueroa, Tamara)
July 24, 2019 Filing 9 Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added John Benko. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Figueroa, Tamara)
July 23, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Mark Steiner Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7795226 by The D.S. Brown Company. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Miller, Jodi)
July 23, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of John Benko Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7795206 by The D.S. Brown Company. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Miller, Jodi)
July 16, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by The D.S. Brown Company. Huntsman Corporation served on 7/15/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. Acknowledgement filed by The D.S. Brown Company. (Miller, Jodi)
July 5, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Healy, Bethaney)
July 5, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Healy, Bethaney)
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by John P. Pucci on behalf of The D.S. Brown Company (Pucci, John)
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The D.S. Brown Company. (Miller, Jodi)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7762886 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by The D.S. Brown Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Category Form)(Miller, Jodi)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The D.S. Brown Company v. White-Schiavone, JV et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The D.S. Brown Company
Represented By: John P. Pucci
Represented By: Jodi Kim Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: White-Schiavone, JV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huntsman Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schiavone Construction Co., LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.F. White Contracting Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?