Rogers v. State Automobile Corporation
Plaintiff: Rickey Rogers
Defendant: State Automobile Corporation
Case Number: 3:2019cv30103
Filed: July 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Katherine A Robertson
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1364
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Filing 15 Copy re 14 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer mailed to Rickey Rogers, 47 Gatewood Road, Springfield, MA 01119 on 9/12/2019. (Finn, Mary)
September 12, 2019 Filing 14 Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting the Defendant's #13 Request for an Extension of Time to Plead re #1 Complaint. State Automobile Corporation's Response is due by no later than 10/10/2019; cc/Pltf. (Finn, Mary) Modified on 9/12/2019 to correct relief sought. (Rivera, Melissa)
September 12, 2019 Filing 13 First MOTION for Extension of Time to 10/10/2019 to file a responsive pleading/answer to the Complaint by State Automobile Corporation.(Etlinger, Deborah) Modified on 9/12/2019 to change the relief type of the motion to MOTION for Extension of Tiem to File and Answer. (Finn, Mary).
September 12, 2019 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by State Automobile Corporation identifying Corporate Parent State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company for State Automobile Corporation.. (Etlinger, Deborah)
September 6, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Deborah Etlinger on behalf of State Automobile Corporation (Etlinger, Deborah)
August 30, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed State Automobile Corporation served on 8/29/2019, answer due 9/19/2019. (Lindsay, Maurice)
August 15, 2019 Filing 9 Remark: The Plaintiff's completed Summons, the U.S. Marshals Service form and the complaint have been received today and the entire packet have been given to the U.S. Marshals for service on the defendant today. (Lindsay, Maurice)
July 31, 2019 Filing 8 Remark - Blank Summons and Marshals Service Forms forwarded to the Pltf. to be completed and returned so the Marshals may make service. (Finn, Mary)
July 31, 2019 Filing 7 Copy re #5 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #6 Summons Issued, mailed to Rickey Rogers, 47 Gatewood Road, Springfield, MA 01119 on 7/31/2019. (Finn, Mary)
July 31, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to State Automobile Corporation. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service.; cc/Plaintiff. (Finn, Mary)
July 31, 2019 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson: ORDER entered granting the Plaintiff's 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis ; cc/Plaintiff. (Finn, Mary) Modified to add order on 8/14/19 (Lindsay, Maurice).
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 General Order 19-02, dated June 1, 2019 regarding Public Access to Immigration Cases Restricted by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2(C). (Rivera, Christina)
July 30, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Finn, Mary)
July 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against State Automobile Corporation d/b/a State Auto Insurance Companies, filed by Rickey Rogers. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet) (Rivera, Christina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rogers v. State Automobile Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Automobile Corporation
Represented By: Deborah Etlinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rickey Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?