Marangoni v. Grand Design RV et al
Plaintiff: Lorenzo M. Marangoni
Defendant: Alpin Haus Ski Shop and Grand Design RV
Case Number: 3:2019cv30126
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Mark G Mastroianni
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Scheduling Conference ISSUED. SEE ATTACHED ORDER FOR DETAILS. Scheduling Conference set for 11/22/2019 at 10:30 AM in Franklin Courtroom before Judge Mark G. Mastroianni. (Rivera, Christina)
September 18, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Jesse Cook-Dubin on behalf of Lorenzo M. Marangoni (Cook-Dubin, Jesse)
September 18, 2019 Filing 10 STATE COURT Record. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Melville, Michael) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/18/2019: #2 State Court Docket Report) (Lindsay, Maurice).
September 13, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Alpin Haus Ski Shop, Grand Design RV.(Melville, Michael)
September 11, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Gerard T. Donnelly on behalf of Alpin Haus Ski Shop (Donnelly, Gerard)
September 11, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael S. Melville on behalf of Alpin Haus Ski Shop (Melville, Michael)
September 9, 2019 Filing 6 Remark: A Certified copy of the Notice of Removal has been sent electronically via email today to Defendants Counsel for service on the State Court in order to obtain the certified State Court record. (Lindsay, Maurice)
September 9, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Mark G. Mastroianni assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson. (Lindsay, Maurice)
September 6, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Grand Design RV. (Donnelly, Gerard)
September 6, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Gerard T. Donnelly on behalf of Grand Design RV (Donnelly, Gerard)
September 6, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael S. Melville on behalf of Grand Design RV (Melville, Michael)
September 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Grand Design RV ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7865215 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 First Amended Complaint - State Court, #2 Civil Docket Sheet - State Court, #3 Grand Design RV Corp. Info - Indiana, #4 Alpin Haus Ski Shop Corp. Info - New York, #5 Amended Civil Action Cover Sheet - State Court, #6 Civil Tracking Order - State Court, #7 Category Form, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Melville, Michael) (Attachment 8 replaced on 9/9/2019) (Lindsay, Maurice).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marangoni v. Grand Design RV et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorenzo M. Marangoni
Represented By: Jesse Cook-Dubin
Represented By: Christopher M. Hennessey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alpin Haus Ski Shop
Represented By: Gerard T. Donnelly
Represented By: Michael S. Melville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grand Design RV
Represented By: Gerard T. Donnelly
Represented By: Michael S. Melville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?