Colangelo et al v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Plaintiff: William J Colangelo and Elizabeth E Colangelo
Defendant: Imerys Talc America, Inc. (sued individually and as Successor-in-interest to Luzenac America, Inc. successor-in-interest to Cyprus Industrial Minerals Company and Metropolitan Talc Co.), Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc., Johnson & Johnson and Imerys Talc America, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv30129
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Katherine A Robertson
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Filing 11 Case Electronically transferred to the District of New Jersey pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order entered by the MDL Panel on 10/08/2019. (Figueroa, Tamara)
October 8, 2019 Filing 10 Certified copy of MDL Conditional Transfer Order number CTO-171 in MDL Case 2738 received from the District of New Jersey requesting transfer of case for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Figueroa, Tamara)
October 8, 2019 Filing 9 Informational copy of MDL Conditional Transfer Order number 171 in MDL Case 2738 received from the mdl panel requesting transfer of case for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Jones, Sherry)
September 19, 2019 Filing 8 SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record as to Imerys Talc America, Inc. by Imerys Talc America, Inc.. (Kelly, Nancy)
September 17, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Imerys Talc America, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Lindsay, Maurice)
September 16, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Taylor S. Lavallee on behalf of William J Colangelo (Lavallee, Taylor)
September 16, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Taylor S. Lavallee on behalf of Elizabeth E Colangelo (Lavallee, Taylor)
September 16, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J. King on behalf of William J Colangelo (King, Matthew)
September 16, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J. King on behalf of Elizabeth E Colangelo (King, Matthew)
September 16, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Lindsay, Maurice)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7876840 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Elizabeth E Colangelo, William J Colangelo. (Attachments: #1 Category Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pellegrino, Raipher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Colangelo et al v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William J Colangelo
Represented By: Raipher D. Pellegrino
Represented By: Taylor S. Lavallee
Represented By: Matthew J. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth E Colangelo
Represented By: Raipher D. Pellegrino
Represented By: Taylor S. Lavallee
Represented By: Matthew J. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imerys Talc America, Inc. (sued individually and as Successor-in-interest to Luzenac America, Inc. successor-in-interest to Cyprus Industrial Minerals Company and Metropolitan Talc Co.)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imerys Talc America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?