Emrit v. Universal Music Group et al
Plaintiff: Ronald Satish Emrit
Defendant: Estate of Shakir Stewart, Island Def Jam Group, Universal Music Group and Rick Ross
Case Number: 3:2019cv30147
Filed: November 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Mark G Mastroianni
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2019 Filing 8 Judge Mark G. Mastroianni: ORDER entered: ORDER DISMISSING CASE. (Rivera, Christina)
December 11, 2019 Filing 7 Copy re #8 Order of Dismissal, #6 Memorandum & ORDER,, 5 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis mailed to Ronald Satish Emrit at: 6655 38th Lane East Sarasota, FL 34243 on 12/11/2019. (Rivera, Christina).
December 11, 2019 Filing 6 Judge Mark G. Mastroianni: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ENTERED: To promote judicial economy and protect parties from vexatious and expensive litigation, a federal court may dismiss a suit when it isduplicative of a suit already pending in another federal court. Rivadeneira v. Dept of Homeland Sec., No. 15-12317-RGS, 2015 WL 4111452, at *1 (D. Mass. July 8, 2015). Accordingly, this action is hereby DISMISSED without prejudice. The motion to proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED as moot. It is So Ordered. SEE ATTACHED MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. (Rivera, Christina) (Main Document 6 replaced on 12/12/2019 to Document with Judge's Signature) (Rivera, Christina).
December 11, 2019 Filing 5 Judge Mark G. Mastroianni: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered DENIED as moot 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Rivera, Christina)
November 29, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF MANUAL FILING by Ronald Satish Emrit. CD will be in the Clerks Office filing room. (Figueroa, Tamara)
November 7, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Mark G. Mastroianni assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson. (Lindsay, Maurice)
November 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Estate of Shakir Stewart, Island Def Jam Group, Universal Music Group, Rick Ross, filed by Ronald Satish Emrit. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet)(Lindsay, Maurice)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Emrit v. Universal Music Group et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Shakir Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Island Def Jam Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Universal Music Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Satish Emrit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?