Fareed et al v. Central Rivers Power MA LLC
Plaintiff: Isabella San Jurjo, Sofia Gallucci, Cynthia Fareed, Jennifer Gallucci, Anna Sepanek, James Maselan, Brayden Gallucci and Tyler San Jurjo
Defendant: Ware River Power, Inc., Central Rivers Power MA LLC and John Doe #1
Case Number: 3:2020cv11053
Filed: June 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Katherine A Robertson
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2020 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ware River Power, Inc.. (Ryder, Ethan)
July 7, 2020 Filing 15 STATE COURT Record. (Notis, Gareth)
June 25, 2020 Filing 14 Ware River Power, Inc. ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Ware River Power, Inc..(Ryder, Ethan)
June 24, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Central Rivers Power MA LLC.(Notis, Gareth)
June 4, 2020 Filing 12 Remark: A Certified copy of the Notice of Removal has been emailed today to Defendants Counsel for service on the State Court in order to obtain the certified State Court record. (Lindsay, Maurice)
June 4, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard J. Shea on behalf of Ware River Power, Inc. (Shea, Richard)
June 4, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Ethan C. Ryder on behalf of Ware River Power, Inc. (Ryder, Ethan)
June 4, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Danieli, Chris)
June 4, 2020 Filing 8 Case transferred in from Eastern Division (Boston) on 6/4/2020 Case Number 1:20-cv-11053. (Danieli, Chris)
June 4, 2020 Filing 7 Case transferred to Western Division (Springfield) (McDonagh, Christina)
June 4, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE by Ware River Power, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, Consent to Removal (Power, Alexandra)
June 4, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra R. Power on behalf of Ware River Power, Inc. (Power, Alexandra)
June 4, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra R. Power on behalf of Ware River Power, Inc. (Power, Alexandra)
June 4, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra R. Power on behalf of Ware River Power, Inc. (Power, Alexandra)
June 4, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra R. Power on behalf of Ware River Power, Inc. (Power, Alexandra)
June 3, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Central River Power MA LLC ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8268900 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Category Form)(Notis, Gareth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fareed et al v. Central Rivers Power MA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isabella San Jurjo
Represented By: William J. Thompson
Represented By: Andrew C. Meyer, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sofia Gallucci
Represented By: William J. Thompson
Represented By: Andrew C. Meyer, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Fareed
Represented By: William J. Thompson
Represented By: Andrew C. Meyer, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Gallucci
Represented By: William J. Thompson
Represented By: Andrew C. Meyer, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna Sepanek
Represented By: William J. Thompson
Represented By: Andrew C. Meyer, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Maselan
Represented By: William J. Thompson
Represented By: Andrew C. Meyer, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brayden Gallucci
Represented By: William J. Thompson
Represented By: Andrew C. Meyer, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyler San Jurjo
Represented By: William J. Thompson
Represented By: Andrew C. Meyer, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ware River Power, Inc.
Represented By: Richard J. Shea
Represented By: Alexandra R. Power
Represented By: Ethan C. Ryder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Rivers Power MA LLC
Represented By: Gareth W. Notis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?