Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB v. Piccone
Plaintiff: Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB
Defendant: Louis A. Piccone and Elena Piccone
Case Number: 3:2020cv11192
Filed: June 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Katherine A Robertson
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2020 Filing 7 STATE COURT Record Louis A. Piccone summons served on 8/3/2020, answer due 8/24/2020.. (Lindsay, Maurice)
June 30, 2020 Filing 6 Remark: A Certified copy of the Notice of Removal has been emailed today to the Defendant for service on the State Court in order to obtain the certified State Court record. (Lindsay, Maurice)
June 30, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Danieli, Chris)
June 30, 2020 Filing 4 Case transferred in from Eastern Division (Boston) on 6/24/2020 Case Number 1:20-cv-11192. (Danieli, Chris)
June 24, 2020 Filing 3 Case transferred to Western Division (Springfield). (Currie, Haley)
June 24, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Louis A. Piccone.(Currie, Haley)
June 24, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Louis A. Piccone from Berkshire County Superior Court, case number 2076CV00084. (Attachments: #1 State Court Record)(Currie, Haley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB v. Piccone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis A. Piccone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elena Piccone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB
Represented By: Michael J Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?