Nazario v. CVS Pharmacy, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Margarita Nazario
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy, Inc. and PepsiCo, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv11228
Filed: June 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Mark G Mastroianni
Referring Judge: Katherine A Robertson
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2020 Filing 14 STATE COURT Record. (Nolan King, Gwen)
July 20, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark T. Boivin on behalf of CVS Pharmacy, Inc. (Boivin, Mark)
July 17, 2020 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Dwyer, Paul)
July 17, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE by CVS Pharmacy, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal CVS PHARMACY, INC.'S JOINDER AND CONSENT TO REMOVAL (Dwyer, Paul)
July 17, 2020 Filing 10 CVS PHARMACY, INC.'S ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by CVS Pharmacy, Inc..(Dwyer, Paul)
July 17, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul E. Dwyer, Jr on behalf of CVS Pharmacy, Inc. (Dwyer, Paul)
July 13, 2020 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case RE-Assignment. Judge Mark G. Mastroianni assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. (Finn, Mary)
July 13, 2020 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson: ORDER entered. ORDER OF RECUSAL entered.(Finn, Mary)
June 30, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by PepsiCo, Inc.. (Nolan King, Gwen)
June 30, 2020 Filing 5 Remark: A Certified copy of the Notice of Removal has been emailed today to Defendants Counsel for service on the State Court in order to obtain the certified State Court record. (Lindsay, Maurice)
June 30, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Danieli, Chris)
June 30, 2020 Filing 3 Case transferred in from Eastern Division (Boston) on 6/25/2020 Case Number 1:20-cv-11228. (Danieli, Chris)
June 25, 2020 Filing 2 Case transferred to Western Division (Springfield) (Baker, Casey)
June 25, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by PepsiCo, Inc. ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8302331 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Category Form)(Nolan King, Gwen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nazario v. CVS Pharmacy, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margarita Nazario
Represented By: Jason R. Herrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Represented By: Paul E. Dwyer, Jr.
Represented By: Mark T. Boivin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PepsiCo, Inc.
Represented By: Gwen G. Nolan King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?