Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. A.D.E. Enterprises, Inc. et al.,
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc., Rick Springfield Music, Embassy Music Corporation, Devo, Inc. d/b/a Devo Music, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, BMG Rights Management GMBH d/b/a BMG Rights Management US LLC d/b/a EMI Virgin Songs, Spirit One Music, A Division of Spirit Music Group Inc., The Bernard Edwards Company LLC, Conducive Music, BMG Rights Management GMBH, Spirit One Music and Devo, Inc
Defendant: A.D.E. Enterprises, Inc. d/b/a Kaptain Jimmy's Restaurant & Distillery, Jeannette Rizos, Zannis Gazis, Antonios Rizos and A.D.E. Enterprises, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv30019
Filed: February 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Mark G Mastroianni
Referring Judge: Katherine A Robertson
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed A.D.E. Enterprises, Inc. served on 3/24/2020, answer due 4/14/2020. (Strong, William)
March 30, 2020 Filing 14 Copy re 13 Notice of Rescheduling mailed to A.D.E. Enterprises, Inc. and Antonios Rizos on 3/30/2020. (Rivera, Melissa)
March 30, 2020 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING ISSUED: The Scheduling Conference is reset to 5/20/2020 at 2:30 PM in Hampshire Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson. (Rivera, Melissa)
March 12, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed Antonios Rizos served on 2/26/2020, answer due 3/18/2020. (Strong, William)
March 10, 2020 Filing 11 Copy re #10 Notice of Scheduling Conference mailed to A.D.E. Enterprises, Inc. and Antonios Rizos on 3/10/2020. (Rivera, Melissa)
March 10, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference ISSUED: A Scheduling Conference is set for 4/14/2020 at 3:00 PM in Hampshire Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson. Joint Statement due by 4/7/2020. See attached Notice for complete details. (Rivera, Melissa)
March 4, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed Zannis Gazis served on 2/28/2020, answer due 3/20/2020. (Strong, William)
February 27, 2020 Filing 8 Judge Mark G. Mastroianni: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson. Referred for: Full Pretrial, No Dispositive Motions (ptn). (Healy, Bethaney)
February 25, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed Jeannette Rizos served on 2/14/2020, answer due 3/6/2020. (Strong, William)
February 24, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by A.D.E. Enterprises, Inc. (Lindsay, Maurice)
February 11, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to A.D.E. Enterprises, Inc., Zannis Gazis, Antonios Rizos, Jeannette Rizos. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Lindsay, Maurice)
February 11, 2020 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Mark G. Mastroianni assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson. (Lindsay, Maurice)
February 7, 2020 Filing 3 REPORT on the filing/termination of copyright case . (Strong, William)
February 7, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by BMG Rights Management GMBH d/b/a BMG Rights Management US LLC d/b/a EMI Virgin Songs, Broadcast Music, Inc., Conducive Music, Devo, Inc. d/b/a Devo Music, Embassy Music Corporation, Rick Springfield Music, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Spirit One Music, A Division of Spirit Music Group Inc., The Bernard Edwards Company LLC. (Strong, William)
February 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Antonios Rizos, Zannis Gazis, A.D.E. Enterprises, Inc. d/b/a Kaptain Jimmy's Restaurant & Distillery, Jeannette Rizos Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8096600 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by BMG Rights Management GMBH d/b/a BMG Rights Management US LLC d/b/a EMI Virgin Songs, Broadcast Music, Inc., Conducive Music, Devo, Inc. d/b/a Devo Music, Embassy Music Corporation, Rick Springfield Music, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Spirit One Music, A Division of Spirit Music Group Inc., The Bernard Edwards Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Exhibit Schedule A)(Strong, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. A.D.E. Enterprises, Inc. et al.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc.
Represented By: William S. Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rick Springfield Music
Represented By: William S. Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Embassy Music Corporation
Represented By: William S. Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Devo, Inc. d/b/a Devo Music
Represented By: William S. Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sony/ATV Songs LLC
Represented By: William S. Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BMG Rights Management GMBH d/b/a BMG Rights Management US LLC d/b/a EMI Virgin Songs
Represented By: William S. Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Spirit One Music, A Division of Spirit Music Group Inc.
Represented By: William S. Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Bernard Edwards Company LLC
Represented By: William S. Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conducive Music
Represented By: William S. Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BMG Rights Management GMBH
Represented By: William S. Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Spirit One Music
Represented By: William S. Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Devo, Inc
Represented By: William S. Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.D.E. Enterprises, Inc. d/b/a Kaptain Jimmy's Restaurant & Distillery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeannette Rizos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zannis Gazis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antonios Rizos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.D.E. Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?