Doe v. Williams College
Plaintiff: John Doe
Defendant: Williams College
Case Number: 3:2020cv30024
Filed: February 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Mark G Mastroianni
Referring Judge: Katherine A Robertson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2020 Filing 13 Judge Mark G. Mastroianni: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson. Case referred for: Full Pretrial, No Dispositive Motions (ptn). (Healy, Bethaney)
April 7, 2020 Filing 12 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Williams College.(Kelly, Elizabeth)
March 6, 2020 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Williams College. (Kelly, Elizabeth)
March 6, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth H. Kelly on behalf of Williams College (Kelly, Elizabeth)
March 6, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Daryl J. Lapp on behalf of Williams College (Lapp, Daryl)
February 21, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by John Doe. All Defendants. (Russcol, David)
February 21, 2020 Filing 7 Judge Mark G. Mastroianni: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #3 Motion to Proceed Under a Pseudonym. (Figueroa, Tamara)
February 19, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Williams College. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Lindsay, Maurice)
February 19, 2020 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Mark G. Mastroianni assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson. (Lindsay, Maurice)
February 18, 2020 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM in Support re #3 Assented to MOTION to Proceed Under a Pseudonym filed by John Doe. (Russcol, David)
February 18, 2020 Filing 3 Assented to MOTION to Proceed Under a Pseudonym by John Doe.(Russcol, David)
February 18, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Ruth K. O'Meara-Costello on behalf of John Doe (O'Meara-Costello, Ruth)
February 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8113413 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Civil Category Form)(Russcol, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Williams College
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Williams College
Represented By: Elizabeth H. Kelly
Represented By: Daryl J. Lapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Represented By: Ruth K. O'Meara-Costello
Represented By: David A. Russcol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?