Hitachi Kokusai Electric Comark LLC s v. Eagle Engineering LLC et al
Plaintiff: Hitachi Kokusai Electric Comark LLC
Defendant: Red River Broadcast Co., LLC and Eagle Engineering LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv30053
Filed: April 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Mark G Mastroianni
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed Eagle Engineering LLC served on 5/13/2020, answer due 6/3/2020. (Dambrov, Robert)
May 20, 2020 Filing 5 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Red River Broadcast Co., LLC.(Lucey, Jeanette)
April 6, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Eagle Engineering LLC, Red River Broadcast Co., LLC. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Danieli, Chris)
April 6, 2020 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Mark G. Mastroianni assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson. (Danieli, Chris)
April 6, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet by Hitachi Kokusai Electric Comark LLC dba Comark Communications. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dambrov, Robert)
April 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8184402 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Hitachi Kokusai Electric Comark LLC dba Comark Communications.(Dambrov, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hitachi Kokusai Electric Comark LLC s v. Eagle Engineering LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Red River Broadcast Co., LLC
Represented By: Jeanette M. Lucey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eagle Engineering LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hitachi Kokusai Electric Comark LLC
Represented By: Robert L. Dambrov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?