Gillespie v. Executive Office of the Trial Court et al
Plaintiff: Vincent Gillespie
Defendant: Executive Office of the Trial Court, John Does 1-10, Paula Carey and Estate of Harry Spence
Case Number: 3:2021cv30083
Filed: July 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Mark G Mastroianni
Referring Judge: Katherine A Robertson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2022 Filing 25 Judge Mark G. Mastroianni: ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #24 Plaintiff's unopposed Motion to Dismiss without Prejudice and finding moot #19 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. This case may now be closed. (Figueroa, Tamara)
February 24, 2022 Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss without Prejudice by Vincent Gillespie.(Zamorski, Michael) (Main Document 24 replaced on 3/3/2022) (Healy, Bethaney).
January 19, 2022 Filing 23 Copy re 22 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, mailed to Vincent Gillespie on 1/19/2022. (Zamorski, Michael)
January 19, 2022 Filing 22 Judge Mark G. Mastroianni: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #21 Plaintiff's Assented to Motion for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff shall file his opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss on or before 2/18/2022. (Zamorski, Michael)
January 18, 2022 Filing 21 Plaintiffs' Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 2/18/2022 to file Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Vincent Gillespie. (Figueroa, Tamara)
January 5, 2022 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM in Support re #19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Paula Carey, Executive Office of the Trial Court. (Batchelor, Andrew)
January 5, 2022 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ( Responses due by 1/19/2022) by Paula Carey, Executive Office of the Trial Court.(Batchelor, Andrew)
December 18, 2021 Filing 18 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case RE-Assignment. Judge Mark G. Mastroianni assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson. (Finn, Mary)
December 17, 2021 Filing 17 Refusal to Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge filed. (Document 16 - Notice of Refusal to Consent - refiled due to incorrect event chosen when originally docketed - this entry replaces it - 17)). (Finn, Mary)
December 17, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE by Executive Office of the Trial Court re #10 Order,,, REFUSAL TO CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE (Batchelor, Andrew)
December 8, 2021 Filing 15 Copy re #14 Summons Issued, mailed to Vincent Gillespie on 12/8/2021. (Zamorski, Michael)
December 8, 2021 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to Paula Carey, Estate of Harry Spence. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Zamorski, Michael)
December 7, 2021 Filing 13 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Vincent Gillespie.(Zamorski, Michael)
November 29, 2021 Filing 12 Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #9 Assented-to Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction nd for Failure to State a Claim. Responses due by 12/7/2021 (Healy, Bethaney)
November 24, 2021 Filing 11 Copy of #10 Order, Instructions, Form and Docket Sheet mailed to Vincent Gillespie on 11/24/2021. (Rivera, Melissa)
November 24, 2021 Filing 10 Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson: ORDER entered. ORDER entered. ORDER re Consent/Declination. In view of the Notice of Case Assignment entered (See Dkt. No. 1), the Court requests that the parties confer and notify the Court in writing, on or before the close of business on December 17, 2021, whether or not the parties consent to the assignment of this case for all proceedings, including the entry of final judgment, to Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73. See attached Order for complete details. (Attachments: #1 Instructions, #2 Consent/Declination Form) (Rivera, Melissa) Modified on 11/24/2021 to correct date. (Rivera, Melissa)
November 16, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time for an additional 3 weeks to File Response/Objection as to #7 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Vincent Gillespie. (Rivera, Christina)
November 2, 2021 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Executive Office of the Trial Court. (Batchelor, Andrew)
November 2, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ( Responses due by 11/16/2021) by Executive Office of the Trial Court.(Batchelor, Andrew)
November 2, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew M. Batchelor on behalf of Executive Office of the Trial Court (Batchelor, Andrew)
October 18, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed Executive Office of the Trial Court served on 10/12/2021, answer due 11/2/2021. (Figueroa, Tamara)
July 23, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Executive Office of the Trial Court. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Lindsay, Maurice)
July 23, 2021 Filing 3 Filing fee/payment: $402.00, receipt number SPR004647 (Lindsay, Maurice)
July 13, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Lindsay, Maurice)
July 12, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Vincent Gillespie. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet)(Zamorski, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gillespie v. Executive Office of the Trial Court et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Gillespie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Executive Office of the Trial Court
Represented By: Andrew M. Batchelor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paula Carey
Represented By: Andrew M. Batchelor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Harry Spence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?