U.S. Bank Trust National Association v. Earl et al
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank Trust National Association
Defendant: Jennifer J Earl, Robert Bryant and Park West Bank and Trust Company
Interested Party: Exelero Corporation and Bank of America
Case Number: 3:2023cv11082
Filed: May 15, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Mark G Mastroianni
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Petition to Quiet Title
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 3, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2023 Filing 19 Judge Mark G. Mastroianni: ORDER entered. ORDER OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT. See Order for complete details. (Figueroa, Tamara)
November 3, 2023 Filing 18 Judge Mark G. Mastroianni: Electronic order entered granting #14 Motion for Default Judgment as to Jennifer J. Earl, Park West Bank and Trust Company n/k/a Key Bank National Association, Exelero Corporation, and Bank of America, N.A. by U.S. Bank Trust National Association. The court finds that it has diversity jurisdiction over this case because Plaintiff, as a national association with a principal place of business in Minnesota is diverse from all defendants and the amount-in-controversy requirement is met. Specifically, the court finds that the fundamental "object of the litigation," Hunt v. Washington State Apple Advert. Comm'n, 432 U.S. 333, 347, (1977), is to facilitate Plaintiffs foreclosure in relation to a debt which exceeds $75,000. See Sheehy v. Consumer Sols. 3, LLC, 2013 WL 1748442, at *1 (D. Mass. Apr. 22, 2013) (explaining that "[c]ourts... 'have repeatedly held that the value of the matter in controversy is measured... by the judgment's pecuniary consequences to those involved in the litigation.'" (quoting Richard C. Young & Co., Ltd. v. Leventhal, 389 F.3d 1 (1st Cir. 2004)). (Figueroa, Tamara)
September 26, 2023 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT of Brian C. Linehan, Esq. by U.S. Bank Trust National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Linehan, Brian)
September 26, 2023 Filing 16 Proposed Document(s) submitted by U.S. Bank Trust National Association. Document received: Proposed Default Judgment Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(b). (Linehan, Brian)
September 26, 2023 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Reneau J. Longoria, Esq. in Support re #14 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Jennifer J. Earl, Park West Bank and Trust Company n/k/a Key Bank National Association, Exelero Corporation, and Bank of America, N.A. filed by U.S. Bank Trust National Association. (Linehan, Brian)
September 26, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Jennifer J. Earl, Park West Bank and Trust Company n/k/a Key Bank National Association, Exelero Corporation, and Bank of America, N.A. by U.S. Bank Trust National Association.(Linehan, Brian)
August 28, 2023 Filing 13 Copy re #12 Notice: Clerk's Entry of Default mailed to Jennifer J. Earl, Bank of America, N.A., Exelero Corporation & Park West Bank and Trust Company on 8/28/2023. (Figueroa, Tamara)
August 28, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE: Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Bank of America, Jennifer J. Earl, Exelero Corporation, Park West Bank and Trust Company. (Figueroa, Tamara)
August 25, 2023 Filing 11 Request for notice of default by U.S. Bank Trust National Association . (Linehan, Brian)
August 25, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by U.S. Bank Trust National Association (Linehan, Brian)
August 25, 2023 Filing 9 STATUS REPORT by U.S. Bank Trust National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Status Report Exhibits)(Linehan, Brian)
July 17, 2023 Filing 8 SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record as to Jennifer Earl by Jennifer J Earl. (Martin, Damien)
July 11, 2023 Filing 7 SUGGESTION OF DEATH Upon the Record as to Robert Bryant by U.S. Bank Trust National Association. (Linehan, Brian)
July 6, 2023 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed Bank of America served on 6/9/2023, answer due 6/30/2023; Jennifer J Earl served on 6/15/2023, answer due 7/6/2023; Exelero Corporation served on 6/21/2023, answer due 7/12/2023; Park West Bank and Trust Company served on 6/6/2023, answer due 6/27/2023. (Linehan, Brian)
May 31, 2023 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Figueroa, Tamara)
May 31, 2023 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by U.S. Bank Trust National Association. (Linehan, Brian)
May 31, 2023 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Mark G. Mastroianni assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson. (Finn, Mary)
May 15, 2023 Filing 2 Case transferred to Western Division (Springfield) (McManus, Caetlin)
May 15, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Exelero Corporation, Jennifer J Earl, Park West Bank and Trust Company n/k/a Key Bank National Association, Robert Bryant, Bank of America Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-9854786 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by U.S. Bank Trust National Association, as Trustee for ABS LOAN TRUST VI. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form, #3 Exhibit)(Linehan, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Bank Trust National Association v. Earl et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank Trust National Association
Represented By: Brian Linehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer J Earl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Park West Bank and Trust Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Exelero Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Bank of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?