Levy et al v. Westfield Bank
Plaintiff: Matthew Levy and Anthony Rondoletto
Defendant: Westfield Bank
Case Number: 3:2024cv30004
Filed: January 5, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Mark G Mastroianni
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2024 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Alyssa Sussman on behalf of Westfield Bank (Sussman, Alyssa)
January 23, 2024 Filing 18 DECLARATION of Alyssa A. Sussman Regarding Class Action Fairness Act Notice and Compliance with Notice Requirements by Westfield Bank. (McKenney, Katherine)
January 22, 2024 Filing 17 Judge Mark G. Mastroianni: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added David M. Berger. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at # https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account. You must put the docket number under ADDITIONAL FILER INFORMATION on your form when registering or it will be rejected.Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm.A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (Zamorski, Michael)
January 22, 2024 Filing 16 Judge Mark G. Mastroianni: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Sophia Goren Gold. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. Counsel may need to link their CM/ECF account to their upgraded individual pacer account. Instructions on how to link CM/ECF accounts to upgraded pacer account can be found at # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-current-pacer-accounts.htm#link-account. (Zamorski, Michael)
January 22, 2024 Filing 15 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of David M. Berger Filing fee: $ 125, receipt number AMADC-10230930 by Matthew Levy, Anthony Rondoletto. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A re Assented-To Motion for Order Authorizing David M. Berger PHV)(Hixon, Jonathan)
January 16, 2024 Filing 14 Judge Mark G. Mastroianni: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Alyssa A. Sussman. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at # https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account. You must put the docket number under ADDITIONAL FILER INFORMATION on your form when registering or it will be rejected.Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm.A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (Figueroa, Tamara)
January 16, 2024 Filing 13 Judge Mark G. Mastroianni: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #12 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Lendon, Tyler)
January 12, 2024 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to File Memorandum of Law in Excess of Page Limits by Matthew Levy, Anthony Rondoletto.(Hixon, Jonathan)
January 12, 2024 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #9 MOTION for Settlement Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement (Unopposed) filed by Matthew Levy, Anthony Rondoletto. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Hixon, Jonathan)
January 12, 2024 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Support re #9 MOTION for Settlement Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement (Unopposed) filed by Matthew Levy, Anthony Rondoletto. (Hixon, Jonathan)
January 12, 2024 Filing 9 MOTION for Settlement Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement (Unopposed) by Matthew Levy, Anthony Rondoletto.(Hixon, Jonathan)
January 11, 2024 Filing 8 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Sophia Goren Gold Filing fee: $ 125, receipt number AMADC-10215494 by Matthew Levy, Anthony Rondoletto. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A re Assented-To Motion for Order Authorizing Sophia Goren Gold PHV)(Hixon, Jonathan)
January 9, 2024 Filing 7 Judge Mark G. Mastroianni: ORDER entered granting #2 Motion to Stay. See attached Order. (Lendon, Tyler)
January 8, 2024 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Westfield Bank identifying Other Affiliate Western New England Bancorp, Inc. for Westfield Bank.. (McKenney, Katherine)
January 8, 2024 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Alyssa A. Sussman Filing fee: $ 125, receipt number AMADC-10209108 by Westfield Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Alyssa A. Sussman)(McKenney, Katherine)
January 8, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine G. McKenney on behalf of Westfield Bank (McKenney, Katherine)
January 8, 2024 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Mark G. Mastroianni assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson. (Cook, Savannah)
January 5, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Settlement (Unopposed) by Matthew Levy, Anthony Rondoletto.(Hixon, Jonathan)
January 5, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Westfield Bank Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number BMADC-10206842 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Matthew Levy, Anthony Rondoletto. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Category Form)(Hixon, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Levy et al v. Westfield Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Levy
Represented By: Jonathan Hixon
Represented By: David M. Berger
Represented By: Sophia Goren Gold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Rondoletto
Represented By: Jonathan Hixon
Represented By: David M. Berger
Represented By: Sophia Goren Gold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westfield Bank
Represented By: Alyssa Sussman
Represented By: Alyssa A. Sussman
Represented By: Katherine G. McKenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?