Doe et al v. City of Worcester et al Featured Case

Equal protection and First Amendment challenge by patrons and homeless coalition based on different borrowing privileges based on permanent address status. Settlement agreement reached and posted here.

Plaintiff: Jane Doe, Suzette Lindgren, Andrew Moyer, Massachusetts Coalition For The Homeless and Central Massachusetts Housing Alliance
Defendant: City of Worcester, Worcester Public Library and Worcester Public Library Board of Directors
Case Number: 4:2006cv40133
Filed: July 6, 2006
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Office: Worcester Office
County: Worcester
Presiding Judge: F. Dennis Saylor
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2006 Filing 25
Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV: ORDER entered. CONSENT ORDER AND SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT.(Jones, Sherry)
December 18, 2006 Filing 23
Proposed Document(s) submitted by Andrew Moyer, Massachusetts Coalition For The Homeless, Central Massachusetts Housing Alliance, City of Worcester, Worcester Public Library, Worcester Public Library Board of Directors, Jane Doe, Suzette Lindgren. Document received: Proposed Consent Order and Settlement Agreement. (Fitzpatrick, Kate)
October 20, 2006 Filing 22
JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference. (Fitzpatrick, Kate)
September 27, 2006 Filing 16
CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Worcester Public Library Board of Directors.(Moore, David)
September 11, 2006 Filing 13
Joint MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference to October 27, 2006 by all plaintiffs.(Fitzpatrick, Kate)
August 31, 2006 Filing 12
NOTICE of Scheduling Conference: Scheduling Conference set for Friday 9/29/2006 at 11:15AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV. (Castles, Martin)
August 28, 2006 Filing 11
ANSWER to Complaint by City of Worcester, Worcester Public Library, Worcester Public Library Board of Directors.(McGuiggan, Janet)
August 17, 2006 Filing 10
US Marshal Process Receipt and Return for summons, complaint, et al. Penelope B. Johnson, Head Librarian; David J. Rushford, City Clerk; Jay Scully, President, Worcester Public Library Board of Directors served Delivered on 8/15/06, 7/25/06 and 8/2/06 respectively. (Hassett, Kathy)
July 6, 2006 Filing 7
AFFIDAVIT of Grace Carmark in Support re 5 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Andrew Moyer, Massachusetts Coalition For The Homeless, Central Massachusetts Housing Alliance, Jane Doe, Suzette Lindgren. (Jones, Sherry)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe et al v. City of Worcester et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Represented By: John Reinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suzette Lindgren
Represented By: John Reinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Moyer
Represented By: John Reinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Massachusetts Coalition For The Homeless
Represented By: John Reinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Central Massachusetts Housing Alliance
Represented By: John Reinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Worcester
Represented By: David M. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Worcester Public Library
Represented By: David M. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Worcester Public Library Board of Directors
Represented By: David M. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?